EP2621255 - Locking mechanism for configurable enclosure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.08.2018 [2018/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hoffman Enclosures, Inc. 2100 Hoffman Way Anoka, MN 55303 / US | [2013/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lakoduk, Harold, Dean 15357 Redium Street Nw Ramsey, 55303, Minnesota / US | 02 /
Schramske, Scott, Allen 5704 Turtle Lake Road Shoreview, 55126, Minnesota / US | 03 /
Lange, Tim, Gordon 11348 Louisiana Avenue N. Champlin, 55316, Minnesota / US | 04 /
Messing, Kent, Gregory 10923 178th Avenue Nw Elk River, 55330, Minnesota / US | 05 /
Wacker, Ronald, Mathew 15570 150th Avenue Foreston, 56330, Minnesota / US | 06 /
Kalstabakken, Robert, Marvin 4182 Highway 90 Nw Cambridge, 55008, Minnesota / US | 07 /
Johnson, Steve, Jerome 334 Jesse James Lane Mahtomedi, 55115, Minnesota / US | 08 /
Modrow, Sheldon, Odell 8116 115th Lane N. Champlin, 55316, Minnesota / US | 09 /
Ricke, Joseph, David 1740 Lake Valentine Road Arden Hills, 55112, Minnesota / US | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | BOVARD AG Patent Attorneys Optingenstrasse 16 3000 Bern 25 / CH | Application number, filing date | 13165179.6 | 01.10.2008 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | US20070976573P | 01.10.2007 Original published format: US 976573 P | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2621255 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2621255 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2621255 | Date: | 04.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05K5/02, H02B1/46, E05B67/38, E05B13/10, H05K7/18 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
H02B1/46 (EP,US);
H05K5/0226 (US);
H02B1/012 (EP,US);
H05K5/0221 (EP,US);
H05K7/183 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49826 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/31] | H05K5/02, H02B1/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/31] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsmechanismus für ein konfigurierbares Gehäuse | [2013/31] | English: | Locking mechanism for configurable enclosure | [2013/31] | French: | Mécanisme de verrouillage pour enceinte configurable | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/24] | 22.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08834855.2 / EP2204081 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2014 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2008 | AT | 04.03.2015 | BE | 04.03.2015 | BG | 04.03.2015 | CY | 04.03.2015 | CZ | 04.03.2015 | DK | 04.03.2015 | EE | 04.03.2015 | ES | 04.03.2015 | FI | 04.03.2015 | HR | 04.03.2015 | IT | 04.03.2015 | LT | 04.03.2015 | LV | 04.03.2015 | MC | 04.03.2015 | MT | 04.03.2015 | NL | 04.03.2015 | PL | 04.03.2015 | RO | 04.03.2015 | SE | 04.03.2015 | SI | 04.03.2015 | SK | 04.03.2015 | TR | 04.03.2015 | NO | 04.06.2015 | GR | 05.06.2015 | IS | 04.07.2015 | PT | 06.07.2015 | GB | 01.10.2015 | IE | 01.10.2015 | LU | 01.10.2015 | CH | 31.10.2015 | LI | 31.10.2015 | FR | 02.11.2015 | [2018/33] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.10.2008 | |
AT | 04.03.2015 | ||
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
BG | 04.03.2015 | ||
CY | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
MT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
GB | 01.10.2015 | ||
IE | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
GB | 01.10.2015 | ||
IE | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
BE | 04.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
GB | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
FR | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
GB | 01.10.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
CH | 31.10.2015 | ||
LI | 31.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
MC | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/26] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
LU | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SI | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
DK | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
IT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
PL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
IS | 04.07.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
CZ | 04.03.2015 | ||
EE | 04.03.2015 | ||
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
RO | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
SK | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
PT | 06.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
NL | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
LV | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 04.03.2015 | |
ES | 04.03.2015 | ||
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
GR | 05.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
FI | 04.03.2015 | ||
HR | 04.03.2015 | ||
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
SE | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 04.03.2015 | |
LT | 04.03.2015 | ||
NO | 04.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 04.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5634357 (NUTTER CURTIS F [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 44 - column 4, line 7; figures 2,3,6,12 *; | [A]US6502872 (MOLZER KLAUS [SE]) [A] 1-15 * column 5, line 16 - line 38; figures 2,8 *; | [A]US6546765 (LINARES RODOLFO A [US]) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 5; figure 2 * |