EP2660152 - Method for identifying an airplane in connection with parking of the airplane at a stand [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.04.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.12.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Decision (+date) in appeal procedure | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TK Airport Solutions, S.A. Poligono Industrial Vega des Bain s/n 33682 Mieres (Asturias) / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | For all designated states TK Airport Solutions, S.A. Poligono Industrial Vaeg des Bain s/n 33682 Mieres (Asturias) / ES | ||
Former [2020/34] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Airport Solutions, S.A. Poligono Industrial Vega des Baina s/n 33682 Mieres (Asturias) / ES | ||
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2019/18] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Airport Solutions, S.A. Poligono Industrial Vega des Baina s/n 33682 Mieres (Asturias) / ES | ||
For all designated states thyssenkrupp AG ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | |||
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states FMT INTERNATIONAL TRADE AB Dalaslingan 8 231 32 Trelleborg / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thelander, Per Höllvikstrandsvägen 69B 236 38 HÖLLVIKEN / SE | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Paustian & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/36] | thyssenkrupp Intellectual Property GmbH ThyssenKrupp Allee 1 45143 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2013/45] | Örtenblad, Bertil Tore, et al Noréns Patentbyra AB P.O. Box 10198 100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13165377.6 | 25.04.2013 | [2013/45] | Priority number, date | SE20120050430 | 30.04.2012 Original published format: SE 1250430 | [2013/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2660152 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2660152 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2660152 | Date: | 04.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2017 | Classification | IPC: | B64F1/305, B64D45/00, B64F1/00, G08G5/00, G08G5/06 | [2018/50] | CPC: |
B64F1/3055 (EP,KR,US);
B64F1/002 (EP,KR,SE,US);
B64D45/00 (RU);
B64F1/305 (RU);
G08G5/0026 (EP,US);
G08G5/06 (RU);
G08G5/065 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2017/14] | B64F1/305, B64D45/00, B64F1/00, G08G5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/45] | B64F1/305, B64D45/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/46] |
Former [2013/45] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | 05.10.2017 | ME | 05.10.2017 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Identifizierung eines Flugzeugs in Verbindung mit dem Parken des Flugzeugs an einem Stand | [2013/45] | English: | Method for identifying an airplane in connection with parking of the airplane at a stand | [2013/45] | French: | Procédé d'identification d'un avion en connexion avec le stationnement de l'avion à une station | [2013/45] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.10.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.10.2017 | Examination requested [2017/46] | 29.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 16.05.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 19.06.2019 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.07.2019 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 24.07.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.03.2018 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.2020
15.06.2020
ADMISSIBLE ADB Safegate Sweden AB Djurhagegatan 19 21376 Malmö / SE Opponent's representative AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2022/11] |
Former [2020/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
04.06.2020
ADMISSIBLE ADB Safegate Sweden AB Djurhagegatan 19 21376 Malmö / SE Opponent's representative AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 30.06.2020 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.11.2020 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.03.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.04.2022 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.04.2022 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Appeal following opposition | 25.05.2022 | Appeal received No. T1335/22 | 25.05.2022 | Payment of appeal fee | 16.08.2022 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.05.2024 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 04.07.2024 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 24.05.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.04.2013 | AL | 04.09.2019 | AT | 04.09.2019 | CY | 04.09.2019 | CZ | 04.09.2019 | DK | 04.09.2019 | EE | 04.09.2019 | FI | 04.09.2019 | HR | 04.09.2019 | IT | 04.09.2019 | LT | 04.09.2019 | LV | 04.09.2019 | MC | 04.09.2019 | MK | 04.09.2019 | MT | 04.09.2019 | PL | 04.09.2019 | RO | 04.09.2019 | RS | 04.09.2019 | SI | 04.09.2019 | SK | 04.09.2019 | SM | 04.09.2019 | BG | 04.12.2019 | NO | 04.12.2019 | GR | 05.12.2019 | IS | 05.01.2020 | PT | 06.01.2020 | IE | 25.04.2020 | LU | 25.04.2020 | CH | 30.04.2020 | LI | 30.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 25.04.2013 | |
AL | 04.09.2019 | ||
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CY | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
MT | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/20] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IE | 25.04.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
LU | 25.04.2020 | ||
CH | 30.04.2020 | ||
LI | 30.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/52] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
MC | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SI | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
DK | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
IS | 05.01.2020 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
SM | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
SK | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
AT | 04.09.2019 | ||
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
IT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
PL | 04.09.2019 | ||
RO | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
EE | 04.09.2019 | ||
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
PT | 06.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 04.09.2019 | |
FI | 04.09.2019 | ||
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
HR | 04.09.2019 | ||
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
LV | 04.09.2019 | ||
RS | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
GR | 05.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
BG | 04.12.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 04.09.2019 | |
LT | 04.09.2019 | ||
NO | 04.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 04.09.2019 | |
NO | 04.12.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004187234 (HUTTON NEIL [CA], et al) [I] 1-5* page 4, paragraph 58 - page 5, paragraph 66; figures 1-28 *; | [I]US2008231472 (HUTTON NEIL [CA]) [I] 1-5 * page 3, paragraph 22 - page 4, paragraph 29; figures 1-5 *; | [I]US2008229525 (HUTTON NEIL [CA]) [I] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 21 - page 3, paragraph 26; figures 1-7 *; | [I]US2009217468 (ANDERBERG NILS-ERIK [SE]) [I] 1-5 * page 2, paragraph 16 * * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 3, paragraph 41; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | SE503396 | SE19810005509 | Opposition | GB2155720 | US5153836 | DE4304562 | US5381140 | US6246320 | US2003083804 | DE4226943 | US2004148067 | US2005198750 | EP1690243 | US2008195301 | US2009217468 | US7619176 | - Anonymous, "ADS-B implementation and operations guidance document. Edition 4.0", ICAO International Civil Aviatin Organization Asia and Pacific Office, (20110901), pages 1 - 38, XP055760934 | - Anonymous, "Guidance material for the asia/pacific region for ADS/CPDLC/AIDC ground systems procurement and implementation. Version 2", ICAO International Civil Aviatin Organization Asia and Pacific Office, (20080501), pages 1 - 53, XP055760938 | - Bernhard Hofmann-Wellenhof, Et Al, "GNSS - Global Navigation Satellite Systems: GPS, GLONASS, Galileo, and more. Excerpt", (20071120), page 3, XP055760942 | - Eurocontrol, "Clarification, Mode S Transponder in an Airport/A-SMGCS Environment", European Prganisation for the Safety of Air Navigation. Edition 1.1, (20050503), pages 1 - 30, XP055760946 |