EP2667626 - METHOD FOR MANAGING MULTIMEDIA FILES, DIGITAL MEDIA CONTROLLER, AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING MULTIMEDIA FILES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pegatron Corporation 5F., 76 Ligong St. Beitou District Taipei City 112 / TW | [2013/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Jih-Wei 5F., NO.76, LIGONG ST. BEITOU DISTRICT 112 TAIPEI CITY / TW | 02 /
Chiu, Po-Jen 5F., NO.76, LIGONG ST. BEITOU DISTRICT 112 TAIPEI CITY / TW | [2013/48] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/48] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13165443.6 | 25.04.2013 | [2013/48] | Priority number, date | TW20120118197 | 22.05.2012 Original published format: TW 101118197 | [2013/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2667626 | Date: | 27.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/41, H04N21/436, H04N21/47, G06F3/0488 | [2013/48] | CPC: |
G06F3/0488 (EP,US);
H04N21/41265 (EP,US);
H04N21/43615 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/48] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verwaltung von Multimediadateien, digitale Mediensteuerung und System zur Verwaltung von Multimediadateien | [2013/48] | English: | METHOD FOR MANAGING MULTIMEDIA FILES, DIGITAL MEDIA CONTROLLER, AND SYSTEM FOR MANAGING MULTIMEDIA FILES | [2013/48] | French: | Procédé pour gérer des fichiers multimédia, contrôleur de média numérique et système pour gérer des fichiers multimédia | [2013/48] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 17.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006262221 (YUASA NAOKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 9,10,13 ** paragraphs [0079] , [0094] *; | [A]US2009138921 (MIYATA KATSUYA [JP]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,7 * * paragraphs [0043] - [0045] - [0058] , [0076] , [0079] , [0083] *; | [A]US2011055878 (MIZUNO CHIKARA [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 8 *; | [I]US2011131520 (AL-SHAYKH OSAMA [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 1,2,6 * * paragraphs [0078] - [0082] - [0086] , [0096] - [0099] - [0106] , [0121] *; | [A]US2011131518 (OHASHI SHIKYO [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0050] - [0052]; figures 4,5,6 * |