EP2657695 - Apparatus and method for attaching a sensing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.03.2015 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Meyer, Paul Aloysius 50 Industrial Park Road Lewiston, PA Pennsylvania 17044 / US | 02 /
Cahill, James Richard 50 Industrial Park Road Lewistown, PA Pennsylvania 17044 / US | 03 /
Matthews, Fred Timothy 50 Industrial Park Road Lewistown, PA Pennsylvania 17044 / US | 04 /
Krohn, Matthew Harvey 50 Industrial Park Road Lewiston, PA Pennsylvania 17044 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth, et al Global Patent Operations Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Picker, Madeline Margaret GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13165525.0 | 26.04.2013 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | US201213458679 | 27.04.2012 Original published format: US201213458679 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2657695 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2657695 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/22, G01N27/90, G01N29/28, H01F7/02 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
G01N27/9093 (EP,US);
G01N29/223 (EP,US);
G01N29/225 (EP,US);
G01N29/28 (EP,US);
H01F7/0215 (EP,US);
G01N2291/2634 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Befestigung einer Sensorvorrichtung | [2013/44] | English: | Apparatus and method for attaching a sensing device | [2013/44] | French: | Appareil et procédé de fixation d'un dispositif de détection | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 31.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/18] | 10.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2297490 (USUI AKIO [JP]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * page 57, line 14 - page 19 * * page 71, line 5 - line 15 * [I] 2,4,5; | [X]JP2002319008 (HANEX CHUO KENKYUSHO KK) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0071] - [0074] *; | [A]US2009267717 (BASKETT MICHAEL D [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0027] - [0041] *; | [A]KR20070101068 (SHIN SUK KYUN [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [I]US2007125189 (BOSSI RICHARD H [US], et al) [I] 6-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] , [0 28] - [0041] *; | [A]US2006162456 (KENNEDY JAMES C [US], et al) [A] 6,13 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0076] * |