EP2657801 - Monitoring of a manufacturing process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. Linder Höhe 51147 Köln / DE | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liebers, Nico Fasanenstr. 7 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Raddatz, Florian Sadeler Chaussee 232 22393 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Schadow, Florian Barnstorfer Weg 4 18057 Rostock / DE | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Aisch, Sebastian, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Aisch, Sebastian, et al Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwaltssozietät Freundallee 13a 30173 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 13165571.4 | 26.04.2013 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | DE201210103753 | 27.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012103753 | [2013/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2657801 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2657801 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/418, G01N29/24 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
G01N29/07 (EP);
G01N29/11 (EP);
G01N2291/0231 (EP);
G01N2291/0251 (EP);
G01N2291/048 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | G05B19/418 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/46] |
Former [2013/44] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Überwachung eines Herstellungsprozesses | [2013/44] | English: | Monitoring of a manufacturing process | [2013/44] | French: | Surveillance d'un processus de fabrication | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 15.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.03.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 15.03.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 24.07.2019 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2019/36] | Appeal following examination | 24.05.2018 | Appeal received No. T2190/18 | 13.07.2018 | Statement of grounds filed | 24.07.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: the application was withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.03.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3822716 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US4921415 (THOMAS III LEWIS J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19737276 (DOERING JOACHIM DR [DE], et al) [AD] 1-10* the whole document *; | [X]DE10138790 (STARK WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2004025592 (THOMAS CHARLES L [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]DE202010007655U (SEUTHE ULRICH [DE]) [A] 3,5,8,10 * paragraphs [0037] , [0038] , [0048] *; | [XP]US2012280414 (GIURGIUTIU VICTOR [US], et al) [XP] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X] - STARK ET AL, "Investigation of curing behaviour of melamine/phenolic (MP) thermosets", POLYMER TESTING, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 29, no. 6, ISSN 0142-9418, (20100901), pages 723 - 728, (20100521), XP027120921 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19737276 | DE19834797 |