EP2800131 - Method for sinter bonding semiconductor devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Technology AG Affolternstrasse 44 8050 Zürich / CH | [2014/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Chunlei Im Tobelacher 24 5406 Rütihof / CH | 02 /
Brem, Franziska Heinrich Wettsteinstrasse 12 8700 Küsnacht / CH | 03 /
Simon, Reinhard Sommerhaldenstrasse 8 5405 Dättwil / CH | [2014/45] | Representative(s) | ABB Patent Attorneys C/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/45] | ABB Patent Attorneys c/o ABB Schweiz AG Intellectual Property CH-IP Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | Application number, filing date | 13165780.1 | 29.04.2013 | [2014/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2800131 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/603 | [2014/45] | CPC: |
H01L24/75 (EP);
H01L24/83 (EP);
H01L2224/2612 (EP);
H01L2224/29339 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/32245 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/7511 (EP);
H01L2224/75272 (EP);
H01L2224/75317 (EP);
H01L2224/7598 (EP);
H01L2224/8309 (EP);
H01L2224/83091 (EP);
H01L2224/83101 (EP);
H01L2224/83191 (EP);
H01L2224/83192 (EP);
H01L2224/83193 (EP);
H01L2224/83203 (EP);
H01L2224/83209 (EP);
H01L2224/83424 (EP);
H01L2224/83447 (EP);
H01L2224/8384 (EP);
H01L2924/10253 (EP);
H01L2924/10272 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/29339, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/8384, H01L2924/20106 (EP);
H01L2224/8384, H01L2924/20107 (EP);
H01L2224/8384, H01L2924/20108 (EP);
H01L2924/13055, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/15787, H01L2924/05032 (EP);
H01L2924/15787, H01L2924/05042 (EP); | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Sinterbefestigung von Halbleiteranordnungen | [2014/45] | English: | Method for sinter bonding semiconductor devices | [2014/45] | French: | Procédé de connexion des dispositifs semi-conducteur par frittage | [2014/45] | Examination procedure | 29.04.2013 | Examination requested [2014/45] | 07.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/46] | 18.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1220310 (NITTO DENKO CORP [JP]) [Y] 4,7 * paragraphs [0022] , [0028] , [0030] , [0032] , [0033] , [0034] , [0036] , [0043] , [0044] , [0045] , [0049] , [0053] , [0092] , [0093] , [0113] , [0114]; figures 2a,2b,3,7 * * paragraph [0035] *; | [XY]EP1280196 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1-3,5-8,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0011] - [0015] - [0025]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 4,7; | [I]WO2007051336 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH], et al) [I] 1-3,6,12,13,15 * page 3, line 5 - line 9 * * page 4, line 16 - line 18 * * page 5, line 27 - line 32 * * page 7, line 10 - line 32; figure 4; claims 1,2,3,5,8,9 * * page 8, line 28 - page 9, line 14 *; | [A]WO2010044179 (SUMITOMO BAKELITE CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-4,6,15* cf. corresponding text to figure 4b;; figure 4b * |