EP2662663 - Optical measuring device with a slider and optical measurement method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Airbus Operations GmbH Kreetslag 10 21129 Hamburg / DE | [2013/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klaas, Andrej Steilshooper Str. 174 22305 Hamburg / DE | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf Patentanwalt Attorney at Law PartG mbB Brienner Straße 11 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13166170.4 | 02.05.2013 | [2013/46] | Priority number, date | DE20121008905 | 08.05.2012 Original published format: DE102012008905 | US201261643960P | 08.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261643960 P | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2662663 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01C11/06 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
G01C11/06 (EP,US);
G01B11/24 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/46] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optische Messvorrichtung mit Verschiebeeinrichtung und optisches Messverfahren | [2013/46] | English: | Optical measuring device with a slider and optical measurement method | [2013/46] | French: | Dispositif de mesure optique équipé d'un curseur et procédé de mesure optique | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 22.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 21.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.07.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US1955116 (HENRY DUCHATELLIER) [X] 1-3,5 * page 1 - page 2; figure 1 * [I] 4,6-10; | [A]GB1086633 (HILGER & WATTS LTD) [A] 1-4* the whole document *; | [I]US6377701 (OHKI MITSUHARU [JP]) [I] 1-10 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0061]; figure 8 *; | [I]US2012069149 (MASUDA TOMONORI [JP]) [I] 1-6 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0055]; figure 1 * | by applicant | US2007018327 |