EP2626130 - Substance-encapsulating vesicle and process for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2013/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kataoka, Kazunori c/o Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | 02 /
Kishimura, Akihiro c/o Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | 03 /
Anraku, Yasutaka c/o Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | 04 /
Miyata, Kanjiro c/o Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | 05 /
Chuanoi, Sayan c/o Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | 06 /
Suma, Tomoya c/o Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | 07 /
Oba, Makoto c/o Japan Science and Technology Agency 1-8, Honcho 4-chome Kawaguchi-shi Saitama 332-0012 / JP | [2013/33] | Representative(s) | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Krauns, Christian Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13166732.1 | 23.05.2011 | [2013/33] | Priority number, date | JP20100117821 | 21.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010117821 | JP20100117823 | 21.05.2010 Original published format: JP 2010117823 | [2013/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2626130 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2626130 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B01J13/04, A61K9/127, A61K47/34, A61K48/00, C08G81/00, B01J13/02 | [2013/33] | CPC: |
A61K9/1273 (EP,US);
A61K9/0087 (US);
B01J13/02 (EP,US);
B01J13/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2013/33] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vesikel mit eingekapselter Substanz und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2013/33] | English: | Substance-encapsulating vesicle and process for producing the same | [2013/33] | French: | Vésicule d'encapsulation de substance et son procédé de production | [2016/27] |
Former [2013/33] | Vésicule dýencapsulation de substance et son procédé de production | Examination procedure | 06.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/12] | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP11783676.7 / EP2572780 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20110783676) is 11.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.05.2011 | AL | 06.07.2016 | AT | 06.07.2016 | BE | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | HR | 06.07.2016 | IT | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MK | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | RS | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | SM | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | NO | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
MK | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 23.05.2011 | |
AL | 06.07.2016 | ||
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 06.07.2016 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/06] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
SM | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
BE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 06.07.2016 | |
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
HR | 06.07.2016 | ||
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RS | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
IT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
NO | 06.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP0721776 (JAPAN RES DEV CORP [JP]) [I] 1-9 * page 3, lines 14-40 *; | [XP]WO2010068432 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH], et al) [XP] 1,2,4,5,9 * page 11, line 20 - page 13, line 13 * * page 18, lines 7-10 ** page 22, lines 1-10 * | by applicant | JPH08188541 | WO9632434 | WO9633233 | WO9706202 | WO2006118260 | - SCHLAAD H. ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2003), vol. 36, no. 5, pages 1417 - 1420 | - ANRAKU Y. ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2010), vol. 132, no. 5, pages 1631 - 1636 | - H. NYIN ET AL., SOFT MATTER, (2006), vol. 2, pages 940 - 949 | - F. SZOKA, JR ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, no. 9, pages 4194 - 4198 | - BATZRI, S. ET AL., BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS ACTA, (1973), vol. 298, pages 1015 - 1019 | - W. TONG ET AL., J. PHYS. CHEM. B, (2005), vol. 109, pages 13159 - 13165 | - RANQUIN A; VERSEES W; MIERE W; STEYAERT J; GELDER PV., "Therapeutic Nanoreactors: Combining Chemistry and Biology in a Novel Triblock Copolymer", DRUG DELIVERY SYSTEM, NANO LETT., (2005), vol. 5, pages 2220 - 4 | - SCHLAAD H ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2003), vol. 36, no. 5, pages 1417 - 1420 | - ANRAKU Y ET AL., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2010), vol. 132, no. 5, pages 1631 - 1636 | - F. SZOKA, JR. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1978), vol. 75, no. 9, pages 4194 - 4198 | - RANQUIN A ET AL., NANO LETT., (2005), vol. 5, pages 2220 - 4 | - A. ZINTCHENKO ET AL., MOLECULAR THERAPY, (2009), vol. 17, no. 11, pages 1849 - 1856 |