EP2803719 - Cleaning composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.03.2019 [2019/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company IP Department One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOUTER, Philip Frank Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | 02 /
JACKSON, Michelle Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | 03 /
CLARE, Jonathan Richard Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | 04 /
MAGENNIS, Euan John Whitley Road, Longbenton Newcastle-upon-Tyne, NE12 9TS / GB | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | Peet, Jillian Wendy Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | [2014/47] | Application number, filing date | 13167664.5 | 14.05.2013 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2803719 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/386, C11D3/50 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
C11D3/50 (EP,US);
C11D17/042 (EP,US);
C11D3/38609 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2014/47] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Reinigungszusammensetzung | [2014/47] | English: | Cleaning composition | [2014/47] | French: | Composition de nettoyage | [2014/47] | Examination procedure | 19.05.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 09.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.10.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/13] | 16.11.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2019/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.04.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 09.09.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 09.09.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.09.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2012058929 (LAUBENDER MATTHIAS [DE], et al) [I] 1-6 * Odorant A; Odorant B; paragraph [0045] *; | [I]US2002169091 (CLARE JONATHAN RICHARD [GB], et al) [I] 1-6 * Perfume A; Perfume B * | by applicant | WO2010115028 | WO2010115021 | US2007275866 | US2004110648 | US2004092414 | US2004091445 | US2004087476 | US6531444 | US6024943 | US6042792 | US6051540 | US4540721 | US4973422 | US5137646 | US2003060390 | US2004204337 | US2007021911 | US2003126282 | US2003139312 | US3664961 | US3919678 | US4222905 | US4239659 | US2220099 | US2477383 | - BRITISH STANDARD EN ISO 15023-2:2006 | EP20090161692 | US20090229981 |