EP2629080 - A condensation apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Particle Measuring Systems Inc. 5475 Airport Boulevard Boulder, CO 80301 / US | [2015/49] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Naneum Limited Unit 59, Canterbury Innovation Centre University Road Canterbury Kent CT2 7FG / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorbunov, Boris Unit 59, Canterbury Innovation Centre University Road Canterbury, Kent CT2 7FG / GB | 02 /
Gnewuch, Harald Unit 59, Canterbury Innovation Centre University Road Canterbury, Kent CT2 7FG / GB | [2013/34] | Representative(s) | Hutchins, Michael Richard, et al Schlich 9 St Catherine's Road Littlehampton, West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | [2016/16] |
Former [2013/34] | Hutchins, Michael Richard Schlich LLP 9 St. Catherine's Road Littlehampton West Sussex BN17 5HS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13168356.7 | 08.05.2009 | [2013/34] | Priority number, date | GB20080008385 | 08.05.2008 Original published format: GB 0808385 | [2013/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2629080 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2629080 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2629080 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/06, G01N15/02, B01D5/00 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
G01N15/065 (EP,US);
B05C3/005 (US);
B01D5/0027 (EP,US);
B05C3/02 (US);
G01N15/02 (EP,US);
G01N2015/0046 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2013/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kondensator | [2013/34] | English: | A condensation apparatus | [2013/34] | French: | Appareil de condensation | [2013/34] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 03.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09742362.8 / EP2279402 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090742362) is 02.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.05.2009 | AT | 20.04.2016 | BE | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | IE | 08.05.2016 | LU | 08.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | MT | 31.05.2016 | GB | 20.07.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 08.05.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
MT | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 08.05.2016 | ||
LU | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 08.05.2009 | |
AT | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
IE | 08.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
GB | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4790650 (KEADY PATRICIA B [US]) [X] 1,13 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 24; figure 2 *; | [X]US5239356 (HOLLAENDER WERNER [DE], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2, lines 49-58 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 54 *; | [XAY]US5675405 (SCHILDMEYER FREDERIC C [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract * * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 3 * * column 5, line 58 - column 6, line 7 * [A] 4-11 [Y] 14; | [XI]US6498641 (SCHILDMEYER FREDERIC [US]) [X] 1,4-6 * column 3, line 50 - column 5, line 40; figure 3 * [I] 12; | [Y]WO03078971 (JAPAN SCIENCE & TECH CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 14* abstract * |