EP2657716 - Electromagnetic measurement system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 07.11.2018 [2018/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quasar Federal Systems, Inc. 5754 Pacific Center Blvd., Suite 203 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2013/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nielsen, Thomas Kurt 1321 Darwin Drive Oceanside, CA 95056 / US | 02 /
Hibbs, Andrew D. 5574 Avenida Fiesta La Jolla, CA 92037 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Ramsay, Laura Anne Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2013/44] | Application number, filing date | 13168444.1 | 11.12.2007 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | US20060874184P | 11.12.2006 Original published format: US 874184 P | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2657716 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2657716 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2657716 | Date: | 12.10.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/12, G01R33/04, G01R33/10, G01R29/08, H03F1/08, H03F1/26, H03F1/30, H03F1/34, H03F1/56 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
G01R33/12 (EP,US);
G01R29/0871 (EP,US);
G01R33/04 (EP,US);
G01R33/10 (EP,US);
G01V3/02 (US);
G01V3/08 (US);
G01V3/083 (EP,US);
H03F2200/261 (EP,US);
H03F2203/45138 (EP,US);
Y02A90/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/44] | G01R33/12, G01R33/04, G01R33/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2013/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektromagnetisches Messsystem | [2013/44] | English: | Electromagnetic measurement system | [2013/44] | French: | Système de mesure électromagnétique | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: Examination on filing A.90(5) {1} | 07.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 26.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 24.07.2013 | Appeal received | 24.07.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 06.08.2013 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07867693.9 / EP2092359 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.12.2007 | AT | 12.10.2016 | BE | 12.10.2016 | CY | 12.10.2016 | CZ | 12.10.2016 | DK | 12.10.2016 | EE | 12.10.2016 | ES | 12.10.2016 | FI | 12.10.2016 | LT | 12.10.2016 | LV | 12.10.2016 | MC | 12.10.2016 | PL | 12.10.2016 | RO | 12.10.2016 | SE | 12.10.2016 | SI | 12.10.2016 | SK | 12.10.2016 | TR | 12.10.2016 | IE | 11.12.2016 | LU | 11.12.2016 | MT | 11.12.2016 | CH | 31.12.2016 | LI | 31.12.2016 | FR | 02.01.2017 | BG | 12.01.2017 | GR | 13.01.2017 | IS | 12.02.2017 | PT | 13.02.2017 | [2018/45] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 11.12.2007 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 11.12.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
MT | 11.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 11.12.2007 | |
AT | 12.10.2016 | ||
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CY | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 11.12.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SI | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
IE | 11.12.2016 | ||
LU | 11.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.12.2016 | ||
LI | 31.12.2016 | ||
FR | 02.01.2017 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
MC | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
BG | 12.01.2017 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
EE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
RO | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
SK | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/34] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
CZ | 12.10.2016 | ||
DK | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 12.10.2016 | |
BE | 12.10.2016 | ||
ES | 12.10.2016 | ||
FI | 12.10.2016 | ||
LT | 12.10.2016 | ||
LV | 12.10.2016 | ||
PL | 12.10.2016 | ||
SE | 12.10.2016 | ||
GR | 13.01.2017 | ||
IS | 12.02.2017 | ||
PT | 13.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 12.10.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0062048 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4-10,12,13 * passages see US7208077 * [I] 3,11; | [XPI]US7208077 (ALBERS JOERG [DE], et al) [XP] 1,2,4-10,12,13 * paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0097] * * paragraph [0133] * * paragraph [0134] * [I] 3,11; | [X]US6424222 (JEONG HOE-SAM [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,8 * paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US2004070446 (KRUPKA MICHAEL ANDREW [US]) [Y] 1-13 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] *; | [YD]US5770945 (CONSTABLE STEVEN C [US]) [YD] 1-13 * abstract * * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 54 * | by applicant | US5770945 | US6686800 | US7088175 |