EP2657649 - Photonic crystal based rotation sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.01.2018 [2018/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tazartes, Daniel A. 23729 Justice Street West Hills, CA 91304 / US | 02 /
Marino, Kenneth D. 2170 St. Michael's Court Brentwood, CA 94513 / US | [2013/44] | Representative(s) | Viering, Jentschura & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Am Brauhaus 8 01099 Dresden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/44] | Viering, Jentschura & Partner Grillparzerstrasse 14 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13169116.4 | 30.08.2007 | [2013/44] | Priority number, date | US20060528133 | 27.09.2006 Original published format: US 528133 | [2013/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2657649 | Date: | 30.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2657649 | Date: | 26.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G01C19/72 | [2013/44] | CPC: |
G01C19/64 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2015/50] |
Former [2013/44] | DE, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Photonischer Rotationssensor auf Kristallbasis | [2013/44] | English: | Photonic crystal based rotation sensor | [2013/44] | French: | Capteur de rotation à base de cristaux photoniques | [2013/44] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/50] | 05.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/03] | 13.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/03] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07841603.9 / EP2069715 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20070841603) is 25.05.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2017 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003053067 (HASHIMOTO YASUHARU [JP]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 10 - page 6, paragraphs 87-88; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]US2006145063 (STEINBERG BEN-ZION [IL], et al) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0011] - [0013] - paragraphs [0047] , [0090] - [0096]; figures 2-4,7-9 * * abstract *; | [Y]EP0678196 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0054]; figures 4,5,7,8,9,10,11,12 *; | [A]US2004263856 (WILLIG REINHARDT L [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029]; figures 1-2E *; | [A]EP1391693 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0009] - [0029] - [0043] *; | [A]US6566155 (NUMAI TAKAHIRO [JP]) [A] 1-11 * column 13, paragraph 7 *; | [A]US2006103851 (NATHAN MENACHEM [IL], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0010] , [0031] , [0032] *; | [A]US2003030814 (OSINSKI MAREK A [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0041] , [0042] * | [A] - CAPPUZZO M A ET AL, "Integrated Resonance-Enhanced Variable Optical Delay Lines", IEEE PHOTONICS TECHNOLOGY LETTERS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20050401), vol. 17, no. 4, doi:10.1109/LPT.2005.844009, ISSN 1041-1135, pages 834 - 836, XP011128832 [A] 1-11 * abstract * * page 834, column 2, paragraphs 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LPT.2005.844009 | [A] - STEINBERG B Z, "Rotating photonic crystals: a medium for compact optical gyroscopes", PHYSICAL REVIEW E (STATISTICAL, NONLINEAR, AND SOFT MATTER PHYSICS) APS THROUGH AIP USA, (200505), vol. 71, no. 5, ISSN 1063-651X, pages 56621 - 1, XP002469311 [A] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevE.71.056621 |