EP2807999 - Composite fabric sheet with inelastic and elastic regions, method for producing the same and hook material in strip form, in particular for a composite fabric sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mondi Consumer Packaging Technologies GmbH Jöbkesweg 11 48599 Gronau / DE | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bader, Herbert Feldbauerschaft 62a 48356 Nordwalde / DE | 02 /
Kurrer, Horst Irma-Sperling-Strasse 54 48599 Gronau / DE | 03 /
Grossmann, Marcel Auf der Delle 1 45309 Essen / DE | 04 /
Fezert, Olga Kardinal-von-Galen-Strasse 75 49809 Lingen / DE | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Lorenz, Bernd Ingo Thaddeus Andrejewski - Honke Patent- und Rechtsanwälte An der Reichsbank 8 45127 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 13169423.4 | 28.05.2013 | [2014/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807999 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2807999 | Date: | 27.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/62, A44B18/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
A61F13/625 (EP);
B29C43/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | Verbundstoffbahn mit elastischen und unelastischen Bereichen, Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Verbundstoffbahn sowie Hakenmaterial in Streifenform, insbesondere für eine Verbundstoffbahn | [2014/49] | English: | Composite fabric sheet with inelastic and elastic regions, method for producing the same and hook material in strip form, in particular for a composite fabric sheet | [2014/49] | French: | Bande de matériau composite dotée de zones élastiques et non élastiques, procédé de fabrication d'une bande de matériau composite et matériau de crochet en forme de bande, notamment pour une bande de matériau composite | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 11.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 07.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP15158574.2 / EP2937067 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/18] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 27.05.2015 | CY | 27.05.2015 | EE | 27.05.2015 | FI | 27.05.2015 | HR | 27.05.2015 | LT | 27.05.2015 | LV | 27.05.2015 | MC | 27.05.2015 | MK | 27.05.2015 | MT | 27.05.2015 | RO | 27.05.2015 | RS | 27.05.2015 | SI | 27.05.2015 | SK | 27.05.2015 | SM | 27.05.2015 | IE | 28.05.2015 | LU | 28.05.2015 | BG | 27.08.2015 | NO | 27.08.2015 | GR | 28.08.2015 | IS | 27.09.2015 | PT | 28.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | CY | 27.05.2015 | |
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MK | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
SM | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/02] | CY | 27.05.2015 | |
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CY | 27.05.2015 | |
EE | 27.05.2015 | ||
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | EE | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
MT | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | EE | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SI | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | EE | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | EE | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
MC | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | EE | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RO | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
SK | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | EE | 27.05.2015 | |
FI | 27.05.2015 | ||
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | FI | 27.05.2015 | |
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
BG | 27.08.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
IS | 27.09.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | FI | 27.05.2015 | |
HR | 27.05.2015 | ||
LT | 27.05.2015 | ||
LV | 27.05.2015 | ||
RS | 27.05.2015 | ||
NO | 27.08.2015 | ||
GR | 28.08.2015 | ||
PT | 28.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP2301502 (NORDENIA TECHNOLOGIES GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,7 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]WO9913745 (MAGAN ARTHUR SHAEN COLVILL [IE]) [AD] 1,16 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US6063466 (TUSCHY JOERG OTTO PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1,16 * column 5, lines 49-57; figure 8 * | by applicant | EP2301502 | EP1736306 | EP2340796 | EP0768075 | WO9913745 |