EP2669343 - Photopolymerizable inkjet ink, ink cartridge, and inkjet printing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo 143-8555 / JP | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiraoka, Takao c/o Ricoh Company, Ltd. 3-6, Nakamagome 1-chome Ohta-ku Tokyo, 143-8555 / JP | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2013/49] | Lamb, Martin John Carstairs Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13169506.6 | 28.05.2013 | [2013/49] | Priority number, date | JP20120124057 | 31.05.2012 Original published format: JP 2012124057 | [2013/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669343 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2669343 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/00, C09D11/10 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
C09D11/00 (US);
C09D11/10 (US);
C09D11/101 (EP,US);
C09D11/106 (US);
C09D11/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | Fotopolymerisierbare Tintenstrahltinte, Tintenpatrone, und Tintenstrahldruckvorrichtung | [2013/49] | English: | Photopolymerizable inkjet ink, ink cartridge, and inkjet printing device | [2013/49] | French: | Encre pour jet d'encre photopolymérisable, cartouche d'encre et dispositif d'impression à jet d'encre | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 28.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 17.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.05.2013 | AL | 26.11.2014 | AT | 26.11.2014 | BE | 26.11.2014 | BG | 26.11.2014 | CY | 26.11.2014 | CZ | 26.11.2014 | DK | 26.11.2014 | EE | 26.11.2014 | ES | 26.11.2014 | FI | 26.11.2014 | HR | 26.11.2014 | IT | 26.11.2014 | LT | 26.11.2014 | LV | 26.11.2014 | MC | 26.11.2014 | MK | 26.11.2014 | MT | 26.11.2014 | NL | 26.11.2014 | PL | 26.11.2014 | RO | 26.11.2014 | RS | 26.11.2014 | SE | 26.11.2014 | SI | 26.11.2014 | SK | 26.11.2014 | SM | 26.11.2014 | TR | 26.11.2014 | NO | 26.02.2015 | GR | 27.02.2015 | IS | 26.03.2015 | PT | 26.03.2015 | IE | 28.05.2015 | LU | 28.05.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 28.05.2013 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MK | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
SM | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/46] | HU | 28.05.2013 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BE | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 28.05.2013 | |
AT | 26.11.2014 | ||
BG | 26.11.2014 | ||
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
TR | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
MT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
IE | 28.05.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SI | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/06] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
MC | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
LU | 28.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
IT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
PL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
SK | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RO | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
DK | 26.11.2014 | ||
EE | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
CY | 26.11.2014 | ||
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 26.11.2014 | |
ES | 26.11.2014 | ||
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
HR | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
LV | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
RS | 26.11.2014 | ||
SE | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
GR | 27.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 26.11.2014 | |
FI | 26.11.2014 | ||
LT | 26.11.2014 | ||
NL | 26.11.2014 | ||
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
IS | 26.03.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
PT | 26.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 26.11.2014 | |
NO | 26.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 26.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6114404 (DEEKEN JOHN S [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, lines 28-30, 48-65 * * column 6, line 2; claims 1,8 *; | [A]EP2390283 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0162] - [0165]; claims 13,14 *; | [A]JP2011207993 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-8 * columns 21-24; claims 1-6 * | by applicant | JP2004526820 | JPH0710894B | - CONTACT DERMATITIS, (1982), vol. 8, pages 223 - 235 | - FUNCTIONAL MATERIAL, (200509), vol. 25, no. 9, page 55 |