EP2669570 - Luminaire and individually replaceable components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.05.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ 08618 / US | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burrows, Paul E. c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 02 /
Krall, Emory c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 03 /
Pang, Huiqing c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 04 /
Paynter, Jason c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 05 /
Rajan, Kamala c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 06 /
Ma, Ruiqing c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | 07 /
McGraw, Gregory c/o Universal Display Corporation 375 Phillips Boulevard Ewing, NJ New Jersey 08618 / US | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/25] | Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/49] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13169771.6 | 29.05.2013 | [2013/49] | Priority number, date | US201261653218P | 30.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261653218 P | US201313895892 | 16.05.2013 Original published format: US201313895892 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2669570 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2669570 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2669570 | Date: | 20.06.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2016 | Classification | IPC: | F21V3/04, F21V17/12, F21S8/06, F21V5/00, // F21Y105/00, F21V17/00 | [2017/51] | CPC: |
F21V5/008 (EP,US);
F21S8/06 (EP,US);
F21V17/12 (EP,US);
F21V3/062 (EP,US);
H10K50/858 (US);
H10K59/879 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2016/27] | F21V3/04, F21V17/12, F21S8/06, // F21Y105/00, F21V17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/49] | F21V3/04, F21V17/12, F21S8/06, // F21Y105/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Title | German: | Leuchte und einzeln auswechselbare Komponenten | [2013/49] | English: | Luminaire and individually replaceable components | [2013/49] | French: | Luminaire et composants remplaçables individuellement | [2013/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/49] | 18.11.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP18173476.5 / EP3401593 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.05.2013 | AL | 20.06.2018 | AT | 20.06.2018 | CY | 20.06.2018 | CZ | 20.06.2018 | DK | 20.06.2018 | EE | 20.06.2018 | ES | 20.06.2018 | FI | 20.06.2018 | HR | 20.06.2018 | IT | 20.06.2018 | LT | 20.06.2018 | LV | 20.06.2018 | MC | 20.06.2018 | MK | 20.06.2018 | MT | 20.06.2018 | NL | 20.06.2018 | PL | 20.06.2018 | RO | 20.06.2018 | RS | 20.06.2018 | SE | 20.06.2018 | SI | 20.06.2018 | SK | 20.06.2018 | SM | 20.06.2018 | TR | 20.06.2018 | BG | 20.09.2018 | NO | 20.09.2018 | GR | 21.09.2018 | IS | 20.10.2018 | PT | 22.10.2018 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 29.05.2013 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
MT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 29.05.2013 | |
AL | 20.06.2018 | ||
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CY | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
PT | 22.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
TR | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
MC | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 20.06.2018 | |
AT | 20.06.2018 | ||
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SI | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
DK | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
ES | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
IT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
SM | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 20.06.2018 | |
CZ | 20.06.2018 | ||
EE | 20.06.2018 | ||
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
PL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RO | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
SK | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 20.06.2018 | |
FI | 20.06.2018 | ||
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
IS | 20.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
NL | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
GR | 21.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
LV | 20.06.2018 | ||
RS | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
HR | 20.06.2018 | ||
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
SE | 20.06.2018 | ||
BG | 20.09.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 20.06.2018 | |
LT | 20.06.2018 | ||
NO | 20.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO0140702 (CREE LIGHTING CO [US]) [X] 1,3,6,10,11,13 * page 8, line 9 - page 9, line 6 * * page 11, line 19 - line 31 * * figure 3c * [I] 2,4,5,8,9; | [XI]EP1431656 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-5,7,10,11,13 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021] * * figures 1-4 * [I] 8,12; | [XI]WO2006035341 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 1-7,9-11,13 * the whole document * [I] 8,12; | [X]WO2008122907 (PHILIPS INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * the whole document *; | [I]US2011175528 (RAINS JR JACK C [US], et al) [I] 1,8,10,12* the whole document * | by applicant | US4769292 | US5247190 | US5703436 | US5707745 | US5834893 | US5844363 | US6013982 | US6087196 | US6091195 | US6097147 | US6294398 | US6303238 | US6337102 | US6468819 | US2003230980 | US2004174116 | US7279704 | US7431968 | US7968146 | US2012161610 | - BALDO ET AL., "Highly Efficient Phosphorescent Emission from Organic Electroluminescent Devices", NATURE, (1998), vol. 395, pages 151 - 154 | - BALDO ET AL., "Very high-efficiency green organic light-emitting devices based on electrophosphorescence", APPL. PHYS. LETT., (1999), vol. 75, no. 3, pages 4 - 6 | WO2007US23098 | WO2009US42829 |