EP2808327 - Novel compounds with semiconducting properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2015 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2015 [2015/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Solvay SA Rue de Ransbeek, 310 1120 Brussels / BE | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caille, Jean-Raphael 7 Rue des Arbaletriers 5000 NAMUR / BE | 02 /
Dabeux, Francois Rue SAint Vincent 114, Bte. 10 1140 EVERE / BE | 03 /
Bolsee, Jean-Christophe Rue de Ransbeek 310 1120 BRUSSELS / BE | 04 /
Fenoll, Mathieu 124 Avenue de l'Opale, Boite 8 1030 SCHAERBEEK / BE | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Dr. Langfinger & Partner In der Halde 24 67480 Edenkoben / DE | [2014/49] | Application number, filing date | 13169825.0 | 29.05.2013 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2808327 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, H01L51/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
C07D519/00 (EP);
H10K85/111 (EP);
H10K85/621 (EP);
H10K85/6572 (EP);
H10K10/484 (EP);
H10K50/15 (EP);
Y02E10/549 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Neue Verbindungen mit Halbleitereigenschaften | [2014/49] | English: | Novel compounds with semiconducting properties | [2014/49] | French: | Nouveaux composés ayant des propriétés semi-conductrices | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2013 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 04.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/52] | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/52] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1410733 (BASF AG) [X] 1,2,4-6 * example -; claim 1 *; | [XY] - HISAO NISHI ET AL, NIPPON KAGAKU KAISHI, (1977), no. 1, doi:10.1246/nikkashi.1977.146, ISSN 0369-4577, pages 146 - 149, XP055080252 [X] 1,2,4-6 * abstract * [Y] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1246/nikkashi.1977.146 | [Y] - TING LEI ET AL, "Influence of Alkyl Chain Branching Positions on the Hole Mobilities of Polymer Thin-Film Transistors", ADVANCED MATERIALS, (20121218), vol. 24, no. 48, doi:10.1002/adma.201202689, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 6457 - 6461, XP055080433 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.201202689 | by applicant | DE1196205 | - REYNOLDS ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2010), vol. 43, pages 8348 - 8352 | - REYNOLDS ET AL., ORGANIC LETTERS, (2010), vol. 12, no. 4, pages 660 - 663 | - REYNOLDS ET AL., MACROMOLECULES, (2011), vol. 44, pages 6303 - 6310 | - REICHENEDER ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., (1969), vol. 81, no. 19, page 742 | - ZHAN ET AL., ADV. MATER., (2011), pages 268 - 284 | - POMMEREHENE, ADV. MATER., (1995), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 551 - 554 | - POMMEREHENE ET AL., ADV. MATER., (1995), vol. 7, no. 6, pages 551 - 554 | - D. ASTRUC ET AL., CAN.J.CHEM., (2006), vol. 84, pages 288 - 299 |