EP2808369 - Base Film for Producing a Graphic Film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.08.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [2018/43] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Saint Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dannewitz, Viktor 3M Deutschland GmbH Carl-Schurz-Str. 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB, et al P.O. Box 86 07 67 81634 München / DE | [2018/43] |
Former [2014/49] | Gabriel, Kiroubagaranne, et al 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 13169841.7 | 30.05.2013 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2808369 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2808369 | Date: | 24.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09J7/00 | [2018/20] | CPC: |
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
B29C65/52 (US);
B32B27/304 (US);
B32B27/36 (US);
B32B3/30 (US);
B32B37/12 (US);
B32B7/05 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
C09J133/00 (US);
C09J7/245 (EP,US);
B29C65/4815 (US);
B29K2627/06 (US);
B29K2667/00 (US);
B29L2031/722 (US);
B32B2327/06 (US);
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | C09J7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2014/49] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Basisfolie zur Herstellung einer grafischen Folie | [2014/49] | English: | Base Film for Producing a Graphic Film | [2014/49] | French: | Film de base pour produire un film graphique | [2014/49] | Examination procedure | 01.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/28] | 07.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 25.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.05.2013 | AL | 24.10.2018 | AT | 24.10.2018 | CY | 24.10.2018 | CZ | 24.10.2018 | DK | 24.10.2018 | EE | 24.10.2018 | ES | 24.10.2018 | FI | 24.10.2018 | HR | 24.10.2018 | IT | 24.10.2018 | LT | 24.10.2018 | LV | 24.10.2018 | MC | 24.10.2018 | MK | 24.10.2018 | MT | 24.10.2018 | NL | 24.10.2018 | PL | 24.10.2018 | RO | 24.10.2018 | RS | 24.10.2018 | SE | 24.10.2018 | SI | 24.10.2018 | SK | 24.10.2018 | SM | 24.10.2018 | TR | 24.10.2018 | BG | 24.01.2019 | NO | 24.01.2019 | GR | 25.01.2019 | IS | 24.02.2019 | PT | 24.02.2019 | GB | 30.05.2019 | IE | 30.05.2019 | LU | 30.05.2019 | BE | 31.05.2019 | CH | 31.05.2019 | FR | 31.05.2019 | LI | 31.05.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 30.05.2013 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
MT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
GB | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 30.05.2013 | |
AL | 24.10.2018 | ||
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
GB | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CY | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
GB | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
GB | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
FR | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/24] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
GB | 30.05.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
BE | 31.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
IE | 30.05.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
TR | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
LU | 30.05.2019 | ||
CH | 31.05.2019 | ||
LI | 31.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/07] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
MC | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SI | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SK | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
EE | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RO | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
SM | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
DK | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
IT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 24.10.2018 | |
AT | 24.10.2018 | ||
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
PT | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
RS | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
SE | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
GR | 25.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 24.10.2018 | |
ES | 24.10.2018 | ||
FI | 24.10.2018 | ||
HR | 24.10.2018 | ||
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
LV | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
PL | 24.10.2018 | ||
BG | 24.01.2019 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 24.10.2018 | |
LT | 24.10.2018 | ||
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
IS | 24.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 24.10.2018 | |
NL | 24.10.2018 | ||
NO | 24.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 24.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2002219785 ; | [Y]WO9400525 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-15* page 7, line 22 - page 8, line 6; figure 1; claims 1-17 *; | [Y]WO9829516 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 65, Database accession no. 2002-604904, XP002716786 & JP2002219785 A 20020806 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US2736721 | USRE24906E | US4181752 | US4418120 | US4833179 | US4968562 | US4994322 | US5141790 | US5209971 | EP0570515 | US5296277 | EP0617708 | US5362516 | WO9513331 | US5461134 | WO9601687 | EP0951518 | US2008299346 | US7691948 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Science and Engineering, WILEY-INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1988), vol. 13 | - Encyclopedia of Polymer Sciences and Engineering, WILEY- INTERSCIENCE PUBLISHERS, (1964), vol. 13 |