EP2669567 - Container with device for receiving and storing the container and a storage assembly and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/49] | Device for receiving and storing a container and a storage assembly and their use | ||
[2020/26] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.07.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.05.2021 [2021/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MT Aerospace AG Franz-Josef-Strauß-Straße 5 86153 Augsburg / DE | [2013/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Friedl, Dr. Josef Petriestrasse 1 86405 Meitingen / DE | 02 /
Murawski, Bernd Stadtjägerstrasse 16A 86152 Augsburg / DE | 03 /
Scheider, Frank Waterloostrsse 44a 86165 Augsburg / DE | 04 /
Wittmann, Michael Krautgartenweg 4 86456 Gablingen / DE | [2013/49] | Representative(s) | Grape, Knut Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/49] | Grape, Knut Grape & Schwarzensteiner Patentanwälte Sebastiansplatz 7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13169931.6 | 30.05.2013 | [2013/49] | Priority number, date | DE20121010463 | 30.05.2012 Original published format: DE102012010463 | [2013/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2669567 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F17C13/08 | [2013/49] | CPC: |
F17C13/00 (EP);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2203/0663 (EP);
F17C2209/227 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Behälter und Vorrichtung zum Aufnehmen und Lagern des Behälters und eine Lageranordnung sowie deren Verwendung | [2020/26] | English: | Container with device for receiving and storing the container and a storage assembly and their use | [2020/26] | French: | Récipient et dispositif destiné à recevoir et loger le récipient, agencement de logement et son utilisation | [2020/26] |
Former [2013/49] | Vorrichtung zum Aufnehmen und Lagern eines Behälters und eine Lageranordnung sowie deren Verwendung | ||
Former [2013/49] | Device for receiving and storing a container and a storage assembly and their use | ||
Former [2013/49] | Dispositif destiné à recevoir et loger un récipient, agencement de logement et son utilisation | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 02.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/18] | 16.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/18] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.08.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2020 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1260755 (SCHWINGENSCHLOEGEL GES M B H [AT]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4376489 (CLEMENS RICHARD E) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US4489846 (NICKEL HERBERT W [US]) [Y] 1-3,6-8,10,11 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE4323510 (EUROCOPTER DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 2,4,9,10,17 * column 1, line 68 - column 2, line 38 *; | [Y]US4976110 (REID ROY C [CA]) [Y] 7,8 * column 3, line 19 - column 4, line 40 *; | [Y]DE102009024387 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022] *; | [A]DE102006043646 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]DE102004060591 (MAGNA STEYR FAHRZEUGTECHNIK AG [AT], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0035] * |