EP2811671 - Satellite distribution device and system with remote selectable modes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2020 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unitron NV Frankrijklaan 27 8970 Poperinge / BE | [2018/23] |
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Unitron Frankrijklaan 27 8970 Poperinge / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cassier, Thierry, Mr. 31 Rue de L'étang 7711 Dottignies / FR | 02 /
Verriest, Christoph, Mr. Tulpenlaan 23 8930 Menen / BE | 03 /
Dalecky, Roman, Mr. Palackeho trida 2408 Zelene predmesti 53002 Pardubice / CZ | 04 /
Caron, Hendrik, Mr. Tybaertstraat 14 8900 Ieper / BE | 05 /
Deleu, Stephen, Mr. Magretstraat 45 9080 Beervelde / BE | 06 /
Lamaire, Willy, Mr. Reningelstraat 70 8954 Heuvelland / BE | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | IP HILLS NV Bellevue 5/501 9050 Gent-Ledeberg / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/50] | Plas, Axel Ivo Michel IP HILLS NV Hubert Frère-Orbanlaan 329 9000 Gent / BE | Application number, filing date | 13170536.0 | 04.06.2013 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811671 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04H40/90 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
H04H40/90 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/30] |
Former [2014/50] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Satellitenverteilungsvorrichtung und System mit entferntem auswählbaren Modi | [2014/50] | English: | Satellite distribution device and system with remote selectable modes | [2014/50] | French: | Dispositif de distribution par satellite et système avec modes sélectionnables à distance | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/30] | 23.10.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.01.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/31] | 31.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2020/31] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2019 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2012257748 (POPA OVIDIU OCTAVIAN [CA], et al) [X] 1-15 * figures 1,3 * * paragraphs [0023] , [0024] , [0028] , [0038] , [0039] *; | [A]DE102009060511 (SPAUN FRIEDRICH [DE]) [A] 3 * paragraph [0005] * | by applicant | US7130576 |