EP2712161 - Method and device for testing subscriber premises equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL LUCENT 148/152 route de la Reine 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/13] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 3, avenue Octave Gréard 75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dardenne, Xavier Rue du Pont au Lin, 19 1390 Grez-Doiceau / BE | 02 /
Drooghaag, Benoît Rue de la Bouvrée, 19 1421 Ophain-Bois-Seigneur-Isaac / BE | [2014/13] | Representative(s) | Lück, Stephan Alcatel-Lucent Deutschland AG Intellectual Property Business Group Lorenzstraße 10 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2014/13] | Application number, filing date | 13170561.8 | 24.09.2012 | [2014/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712161 | Date: | 26.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2712161 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/30, H04M11/06 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
H04B3/48 (EP,US);
H04M11/062 (EP,US);
H04M11/066 (EP,US);
H04M3/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] |
Former [2014/13] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Testen von Teilnehmereinrichtung | [2014/13] | English: | Method and device for testing subscriber premises equipment | [2014/13] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour tester un équipement de locaux d'abonné | [2014/13] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 09.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP12306150.9 / EP2712160 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20120306150) is 17.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2014/29] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Date: | 16.05.2014 | ||
[2014/47] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.09.2012 | AL | 01.07.2015 | AT | 01.07.2015 | BE | 01.07.2015 | BG | 01.07.2015 | CY | 01.07.2015 | CZ | 01.07.2015 | DK | 01.07.2015 | EE | 01.07.2015 | ES | 01.07.2015 | FI | 01.07.2015 | HR | 01.07.2015 | IT | 01.07.2015 | LT | 01.07.2015 | LV | 01.07.2015 | MC | 01.07.2015 | MK | 01.07.2015 | MT | 01.07.2015 | NL | 01.07.2015 | PL | 01.07.2015 | RO | 01.07.2015 | RS | 01.07.2015 | SE | 01.07.2015 | SI | 01.07.2015 | SK | 01.07.2015 | SM | 01.07.2015 | TR | 01.07.2015 | IE | 24.09.2015 | LU | 24.09.2015 | CH | 30.09.2015 | LI | 30.09.2015 | NO | 01.10.2015 | GR | 02.10.2015 | IS | 01.11.2015 | PT | 02.11.2015 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 24.09.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MK | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
TR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 24.09.2012 | |
AT | 01.07.2015 | ||
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
BG | 01.07.2015 | ||
CY | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
NL | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
SM | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
MT | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
BE | 01.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SI | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
IE | 24.09.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
CH | 30.09.2015 | ||
LI | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RO | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
SK | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
CZ | 01.07.2015 | ||
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
EE | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
MC | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
IT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
LU | 24.09.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
DK | 01.07.2015 | ||
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 01.07.2015 | |
ES | 01.07.2015 | ||
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 01.07.2015 | |
FI | 01.07.2015 | ||
HR | 01.07.2015 | ||
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
PL | 01.07.2015 | ||
RS | 01.07.2015 | ||
SE | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
IS | 01.11.2015 | ||
PT | 02.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 01.07.2015 | |
LT | 01.07.2015 | ||
LV | 01.07.2015 | ||
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
GR | 02.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 01.07.2015 | |
NO | 01.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 01.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1079578 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]EP1414180 (MATSUSHITA GRAPHICCOMM SYSTEMS [JP]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0094] - paragraph [0095] * * paragraph [0106] * * paragraph [0139] - paragraph [0141] *; | [A]WO2008051394 (TRENDIUM INC [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraphs [0006] , [00 7] , [0 14] , [0 15] , [0 42] , [0 43]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO2008073327 (ADAPTIVE SPECTRUM & SIGNAL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 2, lines 9-24 * * page 17, line 22 - page 19, line l *; | [A]EP1761012 (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0018] *; | [A]EP2216972 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0035] *; | [A]US2008292064 (WU XIDONG [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] *; | [A]WO2012091725 (ADAPTIVE SPECTRUM & SIGNAL [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * page 12, line 17 - page 19, line 2 * | by applicant | WO2008051394 | WO2008073327 |