EP2811115 - Airfoil for gas turbine, blade and vane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALSTOM Technology Ltd Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Romanowski, Marcin Haldenstrasse 18 5415 Nussbaumen / CH | 02 /
Koenig, Marcel Etzelmatt 3 5430 Wettingen / CH | 03 /
Bogdanic, Laura Berninastrasse 5b 5430 Wettingen / CH | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | General Electric Technology GmbH Global Patent Operation - Europe Brown Boveri Strasse 7 5400 Baden / CH | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 13170564.2 | 05.06.2013 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2811115 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01D5/14 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
F01D5/143 (EP,US);
F01D5/14 (US);
F01D5/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schaufelprofil für Gasturbine, Rotorschaufel und Statorschaufel | [2014/50] | English: | Airfoil for gas turbine, blade and vane | [2014/50] | French: | Profil d'aube pour turbine à gaz, pale et aube de guidage | [2014/50] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 11.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/51] | 20.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/51] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU556238 (VILNER ET AL) [A] 1-4* column 4, line 3 - column 4, line 6; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]WO2005116404 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 5; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1731712 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [A] 1-4 * figure 5; claim 1 *; | [YD]EP2184442 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]) [YD] 1-4 * column 4, paragraph 23 - column 4, paragraph 24; figure 3 *; | [I]US2010284815 (PARKER DAVID [US], et al) [I] 1,3,4 * page 2, paragraph 21 - page 3, paragraph 29; figures 6,9 * | by applicant | US6190128 | GB2353826 | EP2184442 |