EP2680670 - Lighting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/14] | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 7 OBP Panasonic Tower 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 540-6207 / JP | ||
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsubayashi, Yoko c/o Panasonic Corporation Intellectual Property Rights Operations Company IP Development Center 7F, Twin 21 OBP Panasonic Tower, 2-1-61, Shiromi Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2014/01] | Representative(s) | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/01] | Appelt, Christian W. Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13170724.2 | 06.06.2013 | [2014/01] | Priority number, date | JP20120133048 | 12.06.2012 Original published format: JP 2012133048 | [2014/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2680670 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, F21K99/00, F21V1/00 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
F21V9/08 (US);
F21Y2113/13 (EP,US);
F21Y2115/10 (EP,US);
H01L25/0753 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Beleuchtungsvorrichtung | [2014/01] | English: | Lighting device | [2014/01] | French: | Dispositif d'éclairage | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 06.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 01.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 30.09.2020 | 16.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/32] | 26.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/32] | 30.09.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2011004019 (FRICKE CHRISTIAN [DE], et al) [Y] 1-5 * pages 1,2,16; figures 7,11,14,15 *; | [T] - "Toshiba LED Application Notes, Photometry Terms and Units", (20131001), Toshiba, URL: http://www.semicon.toshiba.co.jp/info/docget.jsp?type=AplNote6&lang=en&pid=TL2FK-LL1,L, (20131113), XP002716379 [T] 1 * page 4; table 1 * | [Y] - "Technical Application Guide for PHILIPS LED Lamps 12V PHILIPS EnduraLED 10W MR16 Dimmable", PHILIPS TECHNICAL APPLICATION GUIDES, (20100801), XP055088396 [Y] 1-5 * page 3 * |