EP2674622 - Hydraulic pump with axial pistons which can operate in both directions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hydro Leduc Allée René Leduc 54120 Azerailles / FR | [2013/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Porel, Louis-Claude 70 rue des Moulins 88700 Jeanmenil / FR | [2015/40] |
Former [2013/51] | 01 /
POREL, Louis-Claude 70 rue des Moulins 88700 JEANMENIL / FR | Representative(s) | Loyer & Abello 9, rue Anatole de la Forge 75017 Paris / FR | [2013/51] | Application number, filing date | 13170973.5 | 07.06.2013 | [2013/51] | Priority number, date | FR20120055552 | 14.06.2012 Original published format: FR 1255552 | [2013/51] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2674622 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2674622 | Date: | 15.01.2014 | [2014/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2674622 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F04B1/14, F04B1/16, F04B7/00 | [2014/03] | CPC: |
F04B1/141 (EP,US);
F04B9/04 (US);
F04B1/16 (EP,US);
F04B7/0057 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2013/51] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Hydraulische Pumpe mit Axialkolben, die in beide Richtungen funktionieren | [2013/51] | English: | Hydraulic pump with axial pistons which can operate in both directions | [2013/51] | French: | Pompe hydraulique à pistons axiaux pouvant fonctionner dans les deux sens | [2013/51] | Examination procedure | 27.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/15] | 22.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 21.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 21.08.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 21.08.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.08.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.06.2013 | AL | 30.09.2015 | AT | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | CZ | 30.09.2015 | DK | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | ES | 30.09.2015 | FI | 30.09.2015 | HR | 30.09.2015 | IT | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | MK | 30.09.2015 | MT | 30.09.2015 | NL | 30.09.2015 | PL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | RS | 30.09.2015 | SE | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | SM | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | NO | 30.12.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | IE | 07.06.2016 | LU | 07.06.2016 | BE | 30.06.2016 | CH | 30.06.2016 | FR | 30.06.2016 | LI | 30.06.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
BG | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
MT | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 07.06.2013 | |
AT | 30.09.2015 | ||
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
MK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
SM | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/25] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
CH | 30.06.2016 | ||
FR | 30.06.2016 | ||
LI | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
BE | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
DK | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CZ | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
ES | 30.09.2015 | ||
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
IT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 30.09.2015 | |
FI | 30.09.2015 | ||
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
HR | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RS | 30.09.2015 | ||
SE | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 30.09.2015 | |
NO | 30.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2545929 (ORSHANSKY JR ELIAS) [A] 1,3,4 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 18 * * column 2, line 37 - line 55 * * figures 1,4,5 *; | [A]FR1162272 (M. ERIC OLOV SUNDIN) [A] 1,3,4 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB851701 (NEW PATENTS LTD, et al) [A] 1 * page 2, line 3 - line 27 ** figure 1 * |