EP2719286 - Apparatus with a heater for heating an ice-based frozen product and with a crusher for crushing the product after it has been heated [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.12.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company One Coca-Cola Plaza, NW Atlanta, GA 30313 / US | [2014/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Congiu, Pierpaolo c/o CDN-Loop Edificio EscadeCreapolis Avenida de la Torre Blanca 57 Planta 2, Oficina A01 Sant Cugat del Vallès 08173 Barcelona / ES | 02 /
Lovecchio, Natalia c/o CDN-Loop Edificio EscadeCreapolis Avenida de la Torre Blanca 57 Planta 2, Oficina A01 Sant Cugat del Vallès 08173 Barcelona / ES | 03 /
Brun, Albert c/o CDN-Loop Edificio EscadeCreapolis Avenida de la Torre Blanca 57 Planta 2, Oficina A01 Sant Cugat del Vallès 08173 Barcelona / ES | 04 /
Quintanilla, Alvaro c/o CDN-Loop Edificio EscadeCreapolis Avenida de la Torre Blanca 57 Planta 2, Oficina A01 Sant Cugat del Vallès 08173 Barcelona / ES | 05 /
Forès, Jose Manuel Calzada c/o Asfri C/ Copal 8 46680 Algemesi 46680 Valencia / ES | 06 /
Figueras, Juan c/o Compania de Servicios de Bebidas Refrescantes, S.L. Ribera de Loira 20-22 28042 Madrid / ES | [2014/16] | Representative(s) | Noronha, Catherine Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2014/16] | Application number, filing date | 13171328.1 | 10.06.2013 | [2014/16] | Priority number, date | EP20120175987 | 11.07.2012 Original published format: EP 12175987 | [2014/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2719286 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A23G9/00, F25C5/00, F25C5/04, A23G9/28 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
F25C5/046 (EP);
A23G9/28 (EP);
F25C5/20 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit einer Heizung zum Erwärmen eines Eis-basierten, gefrorenen Produktes, und mit einer Zerkleinerungseinheit zum Zerkleinern des Produktes nachdem es erwärmt worden ist | [2014/16] | English: | Apparatus with a heater for heating an ice-based frozen product and with a crusher for crushing the product after it has been heated | [2014/16] | French: | Appareil avec un chauffage pour réchauffer un produit congelé à base de glace, et avec un broyeur pour broyer le produit après réchauffage | [2014/16] | Examination procedure | 01.11.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 08.11.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 16.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 16.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US6338569 (MCGILL SHANE R [GB]) [X] 1-4,9,15 * column 9, line 36 - column 12, line 28; figures 11-17 * [Y] 5-8,10-12 [I] 14; | [Y]US2008279040 (NEILSON JIM L [US]) [Y] 5-8 * paragraphs [0097] - [0102]; figures 41,42 *; | [Y]EP1710520 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [Y] 10-12 * paragraphs [0076] , [0079] , [0089]; figures 5,6,17,40-44 *; | [X]US2010251733 (KIM SEONG-JAE [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,8,9,13-15 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0066]; figures 2,4-10 *; | [A]US5056688 (GOETZ GLENN E [US], et al) [A] 10-12 * figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2008147045 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 10-13 * paragraphs [0030] - [0052]; figures 3-13 * |