EP2674181 - Supplemental device for determining a set and/or injected dose amount of a syringe or pen injector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.02.2017 [2017/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baek, In-Geol 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kwak, Jae-Kyung 129 Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, 443-742 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/51] | Representative(s) | Birchenough, Lewis HGF Limited Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/51] | Birchenough, Lewis Harrison Goddard Foote LLP Saviour House 9 St Saviourgate York YO1 8NQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13171912.2 | 13.06.2013 | [2013/51] | Priority number, date | KR20120063544 | 14.06.2012 Original published format: KR 20120063544 | [2013/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2674181 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2674181 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/24, A61M5/178, A61M5/315, A61M5/31, G06K9/00 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
A61M5/178 (EP,US);
A61M5/172 (KR);
A61M5/24 (EP,US);
A61M5/31 (US);
A61M5/31525 (EP,US);
G06F18/21 (US);
A61M2205/3306 (EP,US);
A61M2205/3317 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6054 (EP,US);
A61M2205/6072 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/51] | A61M5/24, A61M5/178, A61M5/315 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Zusatzgerät zur Bestimmung der eingestellten und/oder verabreichten Dosis einer Spritze oder eines stiftartigen Injektors | [2013/51] | English: | Supplemental device for determining a set and/or injected dose amount of a syringe or pen injector | [2013/51] | French: | Appareil supplémentaire de mesure de quantité d'injection d'une seringue ou d'un injécteur type stylo | [2013/51] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/12] | 04.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/08] | 11.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/08] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2006120182 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,8,9 * the whole document * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 2; figure 3 * [I] 7; | [XI]US2011009812 (BROWN ROBERT A [US]) [X] 1,8-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0009] , [0012] , [0013] , [0016] , [0017] , [0035] , [0072] , [0081] , [0082] * * pages 1,2,5 * [I] 7; | [XI]WO2011117212 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * abstract * * page 16, lines 15-29 * * page 18, lines 19-23 * * page 20, lines 8-12 * * page 29, line 5 - page 30, line 10 * * page 33, line 17 - page 42, line 32 * * page 47, line 14 * [I] 5,6,8; | [XI]US2012022458 (OH JUNG-TAEK [KR], et al) [X] 1,3,5-7,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0052] - [0069] * [I] 8; | [XI]US2012053527 (CIRILLO WILLIAM [IE], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * abstract * * paragraph [0077] * [I] 5,6,8; | [XP]WO2013004844 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [XP] 1,3,5-7,9,10 * abstract * * page 7, lines 32-34 * * page 2, lines 9-11 * * page 8, line 29 - page 9, line 36 *; | [XP]WO2013004843 (NOVO NORDISK AS [DK], et al) [XP] 1-7,9,10 * abstract * * page 2, lines 8-10 * * page 3, lines 24-28 * * page 10, line 34 - page 11, line 34 * * page 12, lines 29-36 ** page 13, line 24 - page 16, line 8 *; | [XP]WO2013010886 (SANOFI AVENTIS DEUTSCHLAND [DE], et al) [XP] 1,3,5-7,9 * abstract * * page 6, lines 26-32 * * page 8, line 1 - page 9, line 4 * * page 15, lines 1-14 * |