EP2687922 - Agricultural machine with at least one control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.10.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 23.11.2022 [2022/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [2016/48] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states CLAAS Selbstfahrende Erntemaschinen GmbH Münsterstrasse 33 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumgarten, Joachim Buchenweg 26 48361 Beelen / DE | 02 /
Bussmann, Christoph Weimarer Straße 1e 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | 03 /
Neu, Sebastian Warendorfer Straße 11 49196 Bad Laer / DE | 04 /
Vöcking, Henner Dietrich-Bonhoeffer-Strasse 7 33397 Rietberg / DE | 05 /
Kettelhoit, Boris Dürerweg 267 33335 Gütersloh / DE | 06 /
Heitmann, Christoph Dorfstrasse 27b 48231 Warendorf / DE | 07 /
Wilken, Andreas Im Winkel 10 49143 Bissendorf / DE | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | CLAAS Gruppe Mühlenwinkel 1 33428 Harsewinkel / DE | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 13171940.3 | 14.06.2013 | [2014/04] | Priority number, date | DE201210106390 | 16.07.2012 Original published format: DE102012106390 | DE201310106128 | 13.06.2013 Original published format: DE102013106128 | [2014/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2687922 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2687922 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2017 | Classification | IPC: | G05B11/06, A01D41/127 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
A01D41/127 (EP,RU,US);
G05B11/06 (EP,US);
G05B13/024 (EP,US);
A01D41/1276 (RU);
G05B2219/45017 (EP,US);
G05B2219/45106 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2014/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Arbeitsmaschine mit zumindest einer Steuerungseinrichtung | [2014/04] | English: | Agricultural machine with at least one control device | [2014/04] | French: | Machine de travail agricole dotée d'au moins un dispositif de commande | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 14.06.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.05.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 10.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.03.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 06.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/47] | 17.10.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/47] | Appeal following examination | 26.05.2021 | Appeal received No. T1714/21 | 26.05.2021 | Payment of appeal fee | 30.07.2021 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.10.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | EP22201119.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0740896 (CLAAS OHG [DE]) [A] 1-12* column 5, line 8 - column 10, line 20 *; | [I]EP1704767 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0109] *; | [I]EP2401905 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0047] *; | [I]DE102010017676 (CLAAS SELBSTFAHR ERNTEMASCH [DE]) [I] 1-12 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0043] * |