EP2641549 - An endoscopic surgical clip applier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.06.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Covidien LP 15 Hampshire Street Mansfield, MA 02048 / US | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whitfield, Kenneth H. 335 Norton Street New Haven, CT Connecticut 06511 / US | 02 /
Sorrentino, Greg 50 Fairlawn Drive Wallingford, CT Connecticut 06492 / US | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Soames, Candida Jane, et al Maschio & Soames IP Limited 30 Carlton Crescent Southampton SO15 2EW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/33] | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/39] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13172009.6 | 07.10.2005 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | US20040617104P | 08.10.2004 Original published format: US 617104 P | US20040617016P | 08.10.2004 Original published format: US 617016 P | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2641549 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2641549 | Date: | 12.08.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/10, A61B17/128, // A61B17/29 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
A61B17/1285 (EP,US);
A61B17/0682 (US);
A61B17/00234 (US);
A61B17/10 (US);
A61B17/105 (US);
A61B17/122 (US);
A61B17/128 (US);
A61B90/08 (US);
A61B2017/00115 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00367 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00407 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00778 (US);
A61B2017/12004 (US);
A61B2017/2923 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2926 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2927 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0803 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2015/33] |
Former [2013/39] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT | Title | German: | Applikator für endoskopische chirurgische Clips | [2013/39] | English: | An endoscopic surgical clip applier | [2013/39] | French: | Applicateur endoscopique de clips chirurgicaux | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/17] | 19.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05810218.7 / EP1804688 | EP12165484.2 / EP2484294 | Divisional application(s) | EP15173809.3 / EP2957235 | Opposition(s) | 13.05.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4242902 (GREEN DAVID T) [A] 1-15 * figures 8,10 *; | [A]US4712549 (PETERS RUDOLPH [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,10,13 *; | [A]US5049152 (SIMON DENISE M [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1,21 *; | [A]EP0552050 (ETHICON INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 18-20B *; | [A]US5275166 (VAITEKUNAS JEFFREY J [US], et al) [A] 1-15* columns 9,10; figure 8 *; | [A]EP0679367 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *; | [A]EP0769274 (UNITED STATES SURGICAL CORP [US]) [A] 1-15 * figures 5A,8,39 *; | [A]US5938667 (PEYSER MARK S [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * columns 6,7; figures 1,3,7,8,10B,20A, * |