EP2733770 - Rechargeable battery module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 01.07.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Min-Yeol Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Byun, Sang-Won Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 428-5, Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Hyun-Gyu Samsung SDI Co., Ltd., Legal & IP Team 428-5 Gongse-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/21] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstrasse 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2014/21] | Application number, filing date | 13172235.7 | 17.06.2013 | [2014/21] | Priority number, date | KR20120131879 | 20.11.2012 Original published format: KR 20120131879 | [2014/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2733770 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M2/10, H01M2/20, H01M2/34, H01M2/12, H01M2/22 | [2014/21] | CPC: |
H01M50/578 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/572 (KR);
H01M50/209 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/224 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/276 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/3425 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/51 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/516 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/528 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M50/543 (KR);
H01M50/574 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M2200/103 (EP,CN,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wiederaufladbares Batteriemodul | [2014/21] | English: | Rechargeable battery module | [2014/21] | French: | Module de batterie rechargeable | [2014/21] | Examination procedure | 21.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 29.06.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5523178 (MURAKAMI FUMIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]EP2284929 (SB LIMOTIVE CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [A]US2012243130 (GABEN FABIEN [FR]) [A] 1-14 * the whole document * |