EP2683228 - Electronic component box for vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.05.2017 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSIS Co., Ltd. 1026-6, Hogye-Dong Dongan-gu, Anyang-si Gyeonggi-do 431-080 / KR | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Moon, Ki Young c/o LSIS CO., LTD. 1026-6 Hogye-dong, Dongan-gu 431-080 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Young Min c/o LSIS CO., LTD. 1026-6 Hogye-dong, Dongan-gu 431-080 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Hyoung Taek c/o LSIS CO., LTD. 1026-6 Hogye-dong, Dongan-gu 431-080 Anyang-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2014/02] | Representative(s) | Lang, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/02] | Application number, filing date | 13172286.0 | 17.06.2013 | [2014/02] | Priority number, date | KR20120073173 | 05.07.2012 Original published format: KR 20120073173 | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2683228 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2683228 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | H05K9/00, H05K7/00 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
H05K9/0007 (EP,US);
B60R16/02 (KR);
B60R16/00 (KR);
H01H85/00 (KR);
H05K7/20254 (EP,US);
H05K9/002 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/02] | H05K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/12] |
Former [2014/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Elektronische Komponentenbox für ein Fahrzeug | [2014/02] | English: | Electronic component box for vehicle | [2014/02] | French: | Boîtier de composant électronique pour véhicule | [2014/02] | Examination procedure | 17.06.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.02.2017 | Examination requested [2017/12] | 10.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/15] | 15.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2018/15] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.05.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2010208447 (NISHIHATA YOSUKE [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0038] * * paragraph [0041] * [Y] 3-5 [I] 2,6-13; | [Y]US2011192568 (HSIEH YI-HWA [TW], et al) [Y] 3-5 * paragraph [0033] * * sentences 12-14, paragraph 0032 *; | [A]EP2023473 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0087] *; | [A]US2007070606 (GUO QING [TW], et al) [A] 1-13 * abstract * |