EP2816781 - BEHAVIOUR BASED ON PAIRED DEVICE IDENTIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/52] | Behaviour based on paired device identification | ||
[2020/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2021 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.12.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.08.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2023 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2021/03] |
Former [2017/24] | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | ||
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states QNX Software Systems Limited 1001 Farrar Road Kanata, Ontario K2K 0B3 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nathwani, Sanjai 4701 Tahoe Blvd. Mississauga, Ontario L4W 0B5 / CA | 02 /
Duffy, Charles Angus 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 03 /
Jugdeo, Devendra 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 04 /
Stirrett, Allan Jeffrey 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/03] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | ||
Former [2014/52] | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13173115.0 | 20.06.2013 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816781 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816781 | Date: | 20.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/08, H04M1/60, H04W4/48 | [2020/36] | CPC: |
H04L67/30 (EP);
H04W4/48 (EP,US);
H04L67/08 (EP);
H04M1/6091 (EP);
H04W4/80 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | H04L29/08, H04M1/60 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | VERHALTEN BASIEREND AUF DER IDENTIFIZIERUNG EINER VERKNÜPFTEN VORRICHTUNG | [2020/37] | English: | BEHAVIOUR BASED ON PAIRED DEVICE IDENTIFICATION | [2020/37] | French: | COMPORTEMENT SUR LA BASE D'IDENTIFICATION DE DISPOSITIFS APPARIÉS | [2020/37] |
Former [2014/52] | Verhalten basierend auf der Identifizierung einer verknüpften Vorrichtung | ||
Former [2014/52] | Behaviour based on paired device identification | ||
Former [2014/52] | Comportement sur la base d'identification de dispositifs appariés | Examination procedure | 20.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 24.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.08.2020 | 12.08.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.08.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 11.12.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.12.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21152419.4 / EP3829140 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.06.2013 | AL | 20.01.2021 | AT | 20.01.2021 | CY | 20.01.2021 | CZ | 20.01.2021 | DK | 20.01.2021 | EE | 20.01.2021 | ES | 20.01.2021 | FI | 20.01.2021 | HR | 20.01.2021 | IT | 20.01.2021 | LT | 20.01.2021 | LV | 20.01.2021 | MC | 20.01.2021 | NL | 20.01.2021 | PL | 20.01.2021 | RO | 20.01.2021 | RS | 20.01.2021 | SE | 20.01.2021 | SI | 20.01.2021 | SK | 20.01.2021 | SM | 20.01.2021 | BG | 20.04.2021 | NO | 20.04.2021 | GR | 21.04.2021 | IS | 20.05.2021 | PT | 20.05.2021 | IE | 20.06.2021 | LU | 20.06.2021 | BE | 30.06.2021 | CH | 30.06.2021 | LI | 30.06.2021 | [2023/30] |
Former [2023/29] | HU | 20.06.2013 | |
AL | 20.01.2021 | ||
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
BE | 30.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
IT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
IE | 20.06.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
CH | 30.06.2021 | ||
LI | 30.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/18] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
LU | 20.06.2021 | ||
Former [2022/13] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SI | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AL | 20.01.2021 | |
AT | 20.01.2021 | ||
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
MC | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
ES | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RO | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SK | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
DK | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/48] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
CZ | 20.01.2021 | ||
EE | 20.01.2021 | ||
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
SM | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/42] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
IS | 20.05.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/39] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
PL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/38] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
SE | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/37] | AT | 20.01.2021 | |
FI | 20.01.2021 | ||
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
LV | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
RS | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/36] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
BG | 20.04.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
GR | 21.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/35] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
HR | 20.01.2021 | ||
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/34] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NL | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | ||
Former [2021/33] | FI | 20.01.2021 | |
LT | 20.01.2021 | ||
NO | 20.04.2021 | ||
PT | 20.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1729090 (PIONEER CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * abstract * * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] * * paragraphs [0013] - [0023] * * paragraphs [0026] - [0028] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0039] * [Y] 5 [I] 4,6-13; | [XI]US2007182532 (LENGNING MARC [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,11-15 * abstract * * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0005] , [0011] - [0013] * * paragraphs [0015] , [0016] , [0021] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0034] * * paragraphs [0048] - [0055] * * paragraphs [0060] - [0063] * [I] 4,6-10; | [A]EP2466262 (ALPINE ELECTRONICS INC [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0037] - [0062] * * figures 1,4,6 *; | [Y]US2013046510 (BOWNE BENJAMIN F [US], et al) [Y] 5 * abstract * * figures 1,2,6A-6G, 10, 11A-11K,12,13 * * paragraphs [0007] , [0040] - [0048] * * paragraphs [0057] , [0063] * * paragraphs [0091] - [0105] ** paragraphs [0196] - [0216] * | Examination | US2007203646 | US2011009107 | US2012172012 | - Wikipedia, "Bluetooth", (20121230), URL: https://en.wikipedia.org/w/index.php?title=Bluetooth&oldid=530426233, (20160429), XP055269573 |