EP2816873 - LED driver circuit for an automobile hand brake warning light with open- and short-circuit fault detection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROHM CO., LTD. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku Kyoto 615 / JP | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Joita, Adrian Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | 02 /
Mladenova, Irina Rohm Co., Ltd. 21, Saiin Mizosaki-cho Ukyo-ku, Kyoto 615-8585 / JP | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/52] | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13173274.5 | 21.06.2013 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816873 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2816873 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H05B33/08, B60Q1/44 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
H05B45/58 (EP,US);
H05B45/10 (EP,US);
H05B45/50 (EP,US);
H05B45/59 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/31] |
Former [2014/52] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | LED-Treiberschaltung für einen Automobilhandbremswarnleuchte mit Leerlauf- und Kurzschluss-Fehlererkennung | [2014/52] | English: | LED driver circuit for an automobile hand brake warning light with open- and short-circuit fault detection | [2014/52] | French: | Circuit de pilote de LED pour un témoin de frein de l'automobile avec détection d'ouverture et de court-circuit défaut | [2014/52] | Examination procedure | 22.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/31] | 27.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.06.2017 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.06.2013 | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | RS | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | IE | 21.06.2018 | LU | 21.06.2018 | MT | 21.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
MT | 21.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 21.06.2013 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
MT | 21.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
MT | 21.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
MT | 21.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 21.06.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 21.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]US6490512 (NIGGEMANN DETLEF [DE]) [I] 1-10,18 * column 1, line 5 - column 4, line 15; figure 1 * [A] 11-17,19,20; | [Y]EP1308362 (HORLAND INNOVATIONS LTD [GB]) [Y] 15,19 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [00 7] , [00 9] , [0012] , [0016] , [0020] , [0 26] , [0027] , [0 29] * * figures 2,3 *; | [I]EP1458222 (BRITAX P M G LTD [GB]) [I] 1-9,12,13* paragraphs [0004] , [00 5] , [0 12] , [0 13]; figure 1 *; | [IY]US2012074845 (AOKI AKIRA [JP], et al) [I] 1-14,16-18,20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0029] - [0032] - [0038] - [0043] - [0070] - [0091] * * figures 1-4,6,8, 10-14, 16 * [Y] 15,19; | [IA]WO2012077013 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-10,18 * page 1, lines 5-20 * * page 3, lines 17-19 * * page 4, line 24 - page 7, line 14 * * page 9, lines 1-18 * * figures 1-4 * [A] 11-17,19,20 |