EP2816460 - Keyboard and touch screen gesture system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.06.2020 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berglund, Carl Fredrik Alexander Flygarevägen 12 236 38 Höllviken / SE | 02 /
Gärdenfors, Dan Zacharias c/o BlackBerry Sweden AB Torggatan 2 211 40 Malmöm / SE | 03 /
Wasberger, Emil Alexander Svarvaregatan 5b 261 37 Landskrona / SE | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Finnie, Peter John Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 13173308.1 | 21.06.2013 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2816460 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/0488 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
G06F3/04886 (EP);
G06F3/0488 (EP);
G06F2203/04806 (EP);
G06F2203/04808 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Tastatur und Berührungsbildschirmgestensystem | [2014/52] | English: | Keyboard and touch screen gesture system | [2014/52] | French: | Clavier et système de geste à écran tactile | [2014/52] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2013 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 24.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.12.2019 | 05.12.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.01.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/28] | 02.06.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/28] | Appeal following examination | 18.03.2020 | Appeal received No. T1309/20 | 02.06.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US6958749 (MATSUSHITA NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0047]; figures 8,11 *; | [X]US2009225042 (ANDREWS BARRY D [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0048] *; | [I]US2010013777 (BAUDISCH PATRICK M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]US2010283747 (KUKULSKI TIMOTHY W [US]) [A] 1* paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1,4,5 *; | [I]US2011169760 (LARGILLIER GUILLAUME [FR]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0016] *; | [I]US2011285632 (ARAI TAKAHIRO [JP]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0076] *; | [XI]US2012179963 (CHIANG WEN-HSIANG [CN]) [X] 1-3,11,12,14,15 * paragraph [0005]; figure 1 * [I] 4-9,13 |