EP2679132 - Vacuum cleaner with dust filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.12.2019 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.09.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/01] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bräuning, Andre Brunnenstr. 33 98587 Steinbach-Hallenberg / DE | 02 /
Hofmann, Tobias Am Kirchplatz 5 97633 Trappstadt / DE | 03 /
Seith, Thomas Martin-Luther-Str. 9 97616 Bad Neustadt / DE | [2014/01] | Application number, filing date | 13174214.0 | 28.06.2013 | [2014/01] | Priority number, date | DE201210211253 | 29.06.2012 Original published format: DE102012211253 | [2014/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2679132 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2679132 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2679132 | Date: | 06.02.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/16, A47L9/12 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
A47L9/1666 (EP);
A47L9/127 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | A47L9/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/27] |
Former [2014/01] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Staubsauger mit Staubfilter | [2014/01] | English: | Vacuum cleaner with dust filter | [2014/01] | French: | Aspirateur avec filtre à poussière | [2014/01] | Examination procedure | 28.06.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 12.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.05.2018 | Examination requested [2018/27] | 26.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 07.11.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2013 | AL | 06.02.2019 | CY | 06.02.2019 | CZ | 06.02.2019 | DK | 06.02.2019 | EE | 06.02.2019 | ES | 06.02.2019 | FI | 06.02.2019 | HR | 06.02.2019 | IT | 06.02.2019 | LT | 06.02.2019 | LV | 06.02.2019 | MC | 06.02.2019 | MK | 06.02.2019 | MT | 06.02.2019 | NL | 06.02.2019 | PL | 06.02.2019 | RO | 06.02.2019 | RS | 06.02.2019 | SE | 06.02.2019 | SI | 06.02.2019 | SK | 06.02.2019 | SM | 06.02.2019 | TR | 06.02.2019 | BG | 06.05.2019 | NO | 06.05.2019 | GR | 07.05.2019 | IS | 06.06.2019 | PT | 06.06.2019 | AT | 28.06.2019 | IE | 28.06.2019 | LU | 28.06.2019 | BE | 30.06.2019 | CH | 30.06.2019 | LI | 30.06.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
MT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
AT | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 28.06.2013 | |
AL | 06.02.2019 | ||
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
AT | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CY | 06.02.2019 | ||
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
AT | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
AT | 28.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
LU | 28.06.2019 | ||
BE | 30.06.2019 | ||
CH | 30.06.2019 | ||
LI | 30.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/21] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
IE | 28.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
TR | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SI | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
MC | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
PL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
SM | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 06.02.2019 | |
CZ | 06.02.2019 | ||
DK | 06.02.2019 | ||
EE | 06.02.2019 | ||
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RO | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
SK | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | DK | 06.02.2019 | |
ES | 06.02.2019 | ||
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 06.02.2019 | |
FI | 06.02.2019 | ||
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
IT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
HR | 06.02.2019 | ||
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
LV | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
RS | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
IS | 06.06.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
BG | 06.05.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
GR | 07.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NL | 06.02.2019 | ||
SE | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | FI | 06.02.2019 | |
LT | 06.02.2019 | ||
NO | 06.05.2019 | ||
PT | 06.06.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS62204551U (UNKNOWN) [A] 1-13* figure - *; | [A]EP1419724 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0071]; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]US2004098826 (JOO SUNG-TAE [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,5,8-13 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0039]; figure - *; | [XA]GB2483885 (DYSON TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [X] 1-11 * page 16, line 5 - page 20, line 17; figures 1,6a-7 * [A] 12,13 | by applicant | DE1951306 | DE10164279 | US2003208878 | US2004163207 | DE10316668 | JP2005237469 | US2006053757 | US2007209340 | US2008010958 |