EP2820953 - Glomus iranicum var. tenuihypharum var. nov. strain and its use as biostimulant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symborg, S.L. Edificio CEEIM Campus Universitario s/n 30100 Murcia / ES | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Juarez, Jesús SYMBORG, S.L. Edificio CEEIM Campus Universitario s/n 30100 MURCIA / ES | 02 /
Fernandez, Félix SYMBORG, S.L. Edificio CEEIM Campus Universitario s/n 30100 MURCIA / ES | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Carvajal y Urquijo, Isabel, et al Clarke, Modet & Co. Suero de Quiñones, 34-36 28002 Madrid / ES | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13174708.1 | 02.07.2013 | [2015/02] | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820953 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2820953 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N63/04, C12N1/14, A01H17/00, C12R1/645 | [2015/23] | CPC: |
C12N1/14 (EP,RU,US);
A01N65/00 (RU);
A01H17/00 (EP,US);
A01N63/30 (EP,RU,US);
C12N1/145 (EP,RU,US);
C12R2001/645 (EP,RU,US)
| C-Set: |
A01N63/30, A01N25/00, A01N25/08, A01N25/12 (US);
A01N63/30, A01N63/22, A01N25/00, A01N25/08, A01N25/12 (US,RU,EP);
A01N63/30, A01N63/28, A01N25/00, A01N25/08, A01N25/12 (US,RU,EP);
A01N63/30, A01N63/30, A01N25/00, A01N25/08, A01N25/12 (US,RU,EP); |
Former IPC [2015/02] | A01N63/04, C12N1/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | Glomus iranicum var. tenuihypharum, neuer Stamm und dessen Verwendung als biostimulierendes Mittel | [2015/02] | English: | Glomus iranicum var. tenuihypharum var. nov. strain and its use as biostimulant | [2015/02] | French: | Glomus iranicum var. tenuihypharum, souche nouvelle et son utilisation comme biostimulant | [2015/02] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 13.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 19.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.05.2015 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | HR | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | MK | 23.09.2015 | RS | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SM | 23.09.2015 | NO | 23.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/32] | CY | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
MK | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SM | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | EE | 23.09.2015 | |
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
HR | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
RS | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 23.09.2015 | |
NO | 23.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0314439 (NATIVE PLANTS INC [US]); | [A]EP1840110 (INST NAC DE CIENCIAS AGRICOLAS [CU]); | [A]ES2364684 (SYMBORG S L [ES]); |