EP2687926 - Common collaboration context between a console operator and a field operator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.05.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2014/04] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McAdam, Rohan c/o HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | 02 /
Laycock, Graeme c/o HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC., Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2014/04] | Application number, filing date | 13174789.1 | 02.07.2013 | [2014/04] | Priority number, date | US201213551669 | 18.07.2012 Original published format: US201213551669 | [2014/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2687926 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2687926 | Date: | 16.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2014/04] | CPC: |
G05B19/0425 (EP,US);
G06N5/02 (US);
G06Q10/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gemeinsame Kollaborationsinhalt zwischen einem Konsolenoperator und einem Feldoperator | [2014/04] | English: | Common collaboration context between a console operator and a field operator | [2014/04] | French: | Contexte de collaboration commune entre un opérateur de console et un opérateur de champ | [2014/04] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2013 | Examination requested [2014/04] | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 27.05.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/24] | 10.05.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/24] | Appeal following examination | 18.06.2020 | Appeal received No. T1896/20 | 03.09.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 10.05.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant withdrawn | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.07.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009319058 (ROVAGLIO MAURIZIO [IT], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US2008120122 (OLENSKI JON [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [Y]US6167464 (KRETSCHMANN ROBERT J [US]) [Y] 1-10 * column 2 - column 3 *; | [Y] - Sharon Profis, "How to quickly share your screen (and grant control) with Join.me - CNET", CNET, (20111207), pages 1 - 6, URL: https://www.cnet.com/how-to/how-to-quickly-share-your-screen-and-grant-control-with-join-me/, (20160928), XP055306342 [Y] 1-10 * page 1 - page 2 * |