EP2821398 - Method for preparation of 6-trifluoromethylpyridine-3-carboxylic acid derivatives from 4,4,4-trifluoro-3-aminobutanoates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.08.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.09.2016 [2016/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lonza Ltd Lonzastrasse 3930 Visp / CH | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaragoza Dörwald, Florencio Bäretstrasse 2 3930 Visp / CH | 02 /
Täschler, Christoph Terbinerstrasse 33a 3930 Visp / CH | 03 /
Bersier, Michael Haus Wildi 3938 Ausserberg / CH | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13174887.3 | 03.07.2013 | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2821398 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D213/80, C07D213/803, C07C227/04, C07C229/30, C07D211/90 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
C07D213/80 (EP);
C07C227/04 (EP);
C07C227/18 (EP);
C07C229/30 (EP);
C07D211/90 (EP);
C07D213/803 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C227/04, C07C229/30 (EP);
C07C227/18, C07C229/30 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/33] |
Former [2015/02] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 6-Trifluormethylpyridin-3-Carboxyl-Säurederivaten aus 4,4,4-Trifluor-3-Aminobutanoaten | [2015/02] | English: | Method for preparation of 6-trifluoromethylpyridine-3-carboxylic acid derivatives from 4,4,4-trifluoro-3-aminobutanoates | [2015/02] | French: | Procédé de préparation de dérivés d'acide 6-trifluorométhylpyridine-3-carboxylique à partir de 4,4,4-trifluoro-3-aminobutanoates | [2015/02] | Examination procedure | 07.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/33] | 17.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/39] | 04.05.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2016/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO0039094 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 32 *; | [AD]WO2006059103 (PEAKDALE MOLECULAR LTD [GB], et al) [AD] 1-15 * page 38 *; | [AD] - NICOLAS LEFLEMME ET AL, "A Versatile and Efficient Synthesis of 2-Alkyl and 2-Aryl-6-alkyl-2,3-dihydro-1 H -pyridin-4-ones", SYNTHESIS, (20020101), vol. 2002, no. 12, doi:10.1055/s-2002-33648, ISSN 0039-7881, pages 1740 - 1746, XP055077850 [AD] 1-15 * page 1740, scheme 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1055/s-2002-33648 | by applicant | WO0039094 | WO2006059103 | WO2008013414 | WO2012061926 | EP0448542 | - OKADA ET AL., HETEROCYCLES, (1997), vol. 46, pages 129 - 132 | - CEN ET AL., JOURNAL OF FLUORINE CHEMISTRY, (1995), vol. 73, pages 161 - 164 | - D. MA ET AL., ORG. LETT., (2000), vol. 2, pages 2503 - 2505 | - N. LEFLEMME ET AL., SYNTHESIS, (2002), vol. 12, pages 1740 - 1746 |