EP2662994 - Method and arrangement in a communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2014 [2014/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson AB (Publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haartsen, Jacobus Bruchterweg 81 7772 BG Hardenberg / NL | 02 /
Edvardsson, Maria Sjöbrisgränd 14 SE-177 70 Järfälla / SE | 03 /
Dahlman, Erik Tackjärnsvägen 12 SE-168 68 Bromma / SE | 04 /
Baldemair, Robert Honnörsgatan 16 SE-170 69 Solna / SE | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Kühn, Friedrich Heinrich Ericsson AB Patent Unit Kista RAN 1 Torshamnsgatan 23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [2013/46] | Application number, filing date | 13175854.2 | 20.10.2006 | [2013/46] | Priority number, date | SE20050002349 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: SE 0502349 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2662994 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26, H04L1/16, H04L1/18 | [2013/46] | CPC: |
H04B7/2681 (EP,US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W56/001 (EP,US);
H04W56/0045 (EP,US);
H04W72/1268 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung in einem Kommunikationssystem | [2013/46] | English: | Method and arrangement in a communication system | [2013/46] | French: | Procédé et agencement dans un système de communication | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 10.07.2013 | Examination requested [2013/46] | 14.05.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/46] | 20.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/46] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP06828846.3 / EP1952560 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003128681 (RAUSCHMAYER DENNIS [US]); | [E]WO2010019088 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) |