EP2824068 - A method for producing hydrogen and carbon dioxide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.01.2016 [2016/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shell Internationale Research Maatschappij B.V. Carel van Bylandtlaan 30 2596 HR The Hague / NL | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veenstra, Peter Grasweg 31 1031 HW Amsterdam / NL | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Matthezing, Robert Maarten, et al Shell International B.V. Intellectual Property Services P.O. Box 384 2501 CJ The Hague / NL | [2015/03] | Application number, filing date | 13176340.1 | 12.07.2013 | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2824068 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/50 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
C01B3/501 (EP);
C01B2203/02 (EP);
C01B2203/0283 (EP);
C01B2203/0288 (EP);
C01B2203/0405 (EP);
C01B2203/146 (EP);
C01B2203/1628 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Wasserstoff und Kohlenstoffdioxid | [2015/03] | English: | A method for producing hydrogen and carbon dioxide | [2015/03] | French: | Procédé de production d'hydrogène et de dioxyde de carbone | [2015/03] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2013 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 15.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/02] | 21.08.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/02] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010260657 (NIITSUMA TAKUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,7-13 * paragraphs [0118] , [0123] , [0175] , [0177] , [0179] , [0263] , [0264]; table B1 * [I] 2-6,14; | [XI]US6572837 (HOLLAND ROBERT [CA], et al) [X] 1-8,10-14 * column 6, lines 53-66 * * column 7, lines 46-62 * * column 8, lines 20-22,36-54; figure 2; example 1 * [I] 9; | [IA]DE10241669 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [I] 1,3-12 * paragraphs [0003] - [0005] - [0012] , [0025] , [0026] , [0029] , [0034]; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,13,14; | [AD]US7846413 (CLOMBURG JR LLOYD ANTHONY [US], et al) [AD] 1-14 * column 7, lines 44-61 * * column 9, lines 4-30 * | by applicant | US7846413 |