EP2708588 - Fabric care composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.05.2018 [2018/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company IP Department One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2014/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saveyn, Pieter Jan Maria Ellebogten 22 9070 Heusden (Destelbergen) / BE | 02 /
Demeyere, Hugo Jean Marie Linthoutstraat 59 1785 Merchtem / BE | [2014/12] | Representative(s) | Siddiquee, Sanaul Kabir, et al N.V. Procter & Gamble Services Company S.A. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/12] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13176784.0 | 17.07.2013 | [2014/12] | Priority number, date | EP20120184483 | 14.09.2012 Original published format: EP 12184483 | [2014/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2708588 | Date: | 19.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/02, C11D1/38, C11D1/66, C11D1/835, C11D3/37, C11D3/50 | [2014/12] | CPC: |
C11D3/0026 (EP,US);
C11D1/66 (EP,US);
C11D1/825 (EP,US);
C11D1/83 (EP,US);
C11D1/835 (EP,US);
C11D1/86 (EP,US);
C11D3/373 (EP,US);
C11D3/505 (EP,US);
C11D1/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/12] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Stoffpflegezusammensetzung | [2014/12] | English: | Fabric care composition | [2014/12] | French: | Composition de traitement de tissu | [2014/12] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/44] | 20.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/19] | 03.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008147934 (HEALTHPRO BRANDS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7 * compounds H,I,L,M *; | [X]WO0215663 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,5,6 * example 2; compounds A-D * * example 3; compounds B,F * * the Antibacterial Presiva Soft Formulations;; example 4; compounds A-D * * the 3:1 Formulas;; example 5; compounds B,F * * example 6; compounds A-D *; | [X]WO0107710 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-7 * examples 1-6; table 2 * * examples 1-6; table 3 * * examples 1-70; table 4 * * examples 1-12; table 5 * * examples 1-10; table 6 * * example -; table 7 *; | [I] - KOLB B, "Application of an automated head-space procedure for trace analysis by gas chromatography", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V, NL, (19760101), vol. 122, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 553 - 568, XP002687243 [I] 1-10 * the last paragraph; page 557 * * page 558; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(00)82276-1 | [I] - BERGLUND L G ET AL, "Simulation of the Thermal Effects of Dissolved Materials in Human Sweat", COMPUTERS AND BIOMEDICAL RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (19730101), vol. 6, ISSN 0010-4809, pages 127 - 138, XP002687242 [I] 1-10 * the bridging paragraph; page 136 - page 137 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0010-4809(73)90052-9 | by applicant | US4128484 | US4022938 | US6150322 | US6153577 | US6020303 | US6093856 | US4565647 | US4483780 | US4483779 | US5332528 | WO9206162 | WO9319146 | WO9319038 | WO9409099 | US6482994 | WO0142408 | US5670476 | US2954347 | US5707950 | US5728671 | US2003060390 | EP0210731 | EP0210721 | US2007275866 | US2004110648 | US2004092414 | US2004091445 | US2004087476 | US6531444 | US6024943 | US6042792 | US6051540 | US4540721 | US4973422 | WO2011148110 |