EP2826702 - Hull for an ocean-going workboat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.11.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baltic Workboats AS Sadama tee 26 Nasva alevik, Saaremaa vald 93872 Saare maakond / EE | [2018/50] |
Former [2015/04] | For all designated states Baltic Workboats AS Kaarma vald 93872 Nasva / EE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vanaselja, Marcus Paljassaare 14 10313 Tallinn / EE | 02 /
Andreasson, Henrik Box 118 47511 Hälsö / SE | 03 /
Taal, Jüri Paljassaare 14 10313 Tallinn / EE | 04 /
Van Looy, Armand Berkenlaan 1 9250 Waasmunster / BE | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Philippaerts, Yannick, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2015/04] | Application number, filing date | 13177109.9 | 18.07.2013 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2826702 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2826702 | Date: | 16.01.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B63B1/20, B63B1/06 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B63B1/20 (EP);
B63B1/063 (EP);
B63B2001/201 (EP);
B63B2039/067 (EP);
Y02T70/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/35] |
Former [2015/04] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Rumpf für hochseetüchtiges Arbeitsboot | [2015/04] | English: | Hull for an ocean-going workboat | [2015/04] | French: | Coque d'un bateau usine hauturier | [2015/04] | Examination procedure | 16.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.07.2015 | Examination requested [2015/35] | 27.09.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.09.2018 | Opposition(s) | 17.10.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.12.2015 | 31.07.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2016 | 31.07.2017 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   27.09.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2013 | AL | 16.01.2019 | AT | 16.01.2019 | CY | 16.01.2019 | CZ | 16.01.2019 | DK | 16.01.2019 | MC | 16.01.2019 | MK | 16.01.2019 | MT | 16.01.2019 | RO | 16.01.2019 | RS | 16.01.2019 | SI | 16.01.2019 | SK | 16.01.2019 | SM | 16.01.2019 | TR | 16.01.2019 | BG | 16.04.2019 | GR | 17.04.2019 | IS | 16.05.2019 | PT | 16.05.2019 | LU | 18.07.2019 | CH | 31.07.2019 | LI | 31.07.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/34] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
MT | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/32] | HU | 18.07.2013 | |
AL | 16.01.2019 | ||
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CY | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
LU | 18.07.2019 | ||
CH | 31.07.2019 | ||
LI | 31.07.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
TR | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
MC | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2020/13] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SI | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
SM | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 16.01.2019 | |
AT | 16.01.2019 | ||
CZ | 16.01.2019 | ||
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
RO | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
SK | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
DK | 16.01.2019 | ||
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 16.01.2019 | |
RS | 16.01.2019 | ||
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/39] | RS | 16.01.2019 | |
BG | 16.04.2019 | ||
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
IS | 16.05.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/38] | BG | 16.04.2019 | |
GR | 17.04.2019 | ||
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | GR | 17.04.2019 | |
PT | 16.05.2019 | ||
Former [2019/33] | PT | 16.05.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO8906620 (CAMMANN GERHARD [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,13 * page 5, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 1 * * abstract * [I] 5,8,9,11,12,14; | [AD]FR2726804 (MARCHAND DIDIER LOUIS EMILE [FR]) [AD] 1,5,13 * abstract * * page 3, lines 10-30 * * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]WO2010103170 (AKER ARCTIC TECHNOLOGY INC [FI], et al) [X] 1,13 * page 1, lines 4-9 * * page 5, lines 1-29 * * abstract * [I] 14; | [A]US2013068154 (OPHARDT HERMANN [DE]) [A] 13,14 * abstract * * claim 1 ** figures 1-13 * | by applicant | FR2726804 | US2003089290 | US7658159 |