EP2703312 - Improved tube head including an insert forming a barrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Albéa Services ZAC des Barbanniers 1 avenue du Général de Gaulle "Le Signac" 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2014/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kerman, Eric 13 rue Jean-Baptiste Biot 51000 Châlons-en-Champagne / FR | 02 /
Maurice, Thierry 10 rue René Lemoine 51000 Châlons-en-Champagne / FR | 03 /
Jammet, Jean-Claude 99 rue Richard de Fourniva 80090 Amiens / FR | 04 /
Hermant, Etienne 17 rue Général Fery 51000 Châlons-en-Champagne / FR | 05 /
Liard, Jérôme c/o ALBEA SERVICES 1 avenue du Général De Gaulle - ZAC Des Barbanniers - "Le Signac" 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | [2015/11] |
Former [2014/10] | 01 /
Kerman, Eric 13 rue Jean-Baptiste Biot 51000 Chalons en Champagne / FR | ||
02 /
Maurice, Thierry 10 rue René Lemoine 51000 Chalons en Champagne / FR | |||
03 /
Jammet, Jean-Claude 99 rue Richard de Fourniva 80090 Amiens / FR | |||
04 /
Hermant, Etienne 17 rue Général Fery 51000 Chalons en Champagne / FR | |||
05 /
Liard, Jérôme c/o ALBEA SERVICES 1 avenue du Général De Gaulle - ZAC Des Barbanniers - "Le Signac" 92230 Gennevilliers / FR | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13178391.2 | 29.07.2013 | [2014/10] | Priority number, date | FR20120058047 | 28.08.2012 Original published format: FR 1258047 | [2014/10] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2703312 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | FR | [2014/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2703312 | Date: | 11.03.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D35/10 | [2014/10] | CPC: |
B65D35/10 (EP,RU,US);
B65D23/00 (RU,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/10] | Title | German: | Verbesserter Rohrkopf mit schrankenbildendem Einsatz | [2014/10] | English: | Improved tube head including an insert forming a barrier | [2014/10] | French: | Tête de tube améliorée comprenant un insert formant barrière | [2014/10] | Examination procedure | 05.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/42] | 17.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 27.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.11.2014 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE PackSys Global AG Joweid Zentrum 1 8630 Rüti ZH / CH Opponent's representative Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behrmann Wagner PartG mbB, et al, et al Hegau-Tower Maggistraße 5 (11. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.2015
15.12.2015
ADMISSIBLE PackSys Global AG Joweid Zentrum 1 8630 Rüti ZH / CH Opponent's representative Patentanwälte Behrmann Wagner PartG mbB, et al, et al Maggistraße 5 Hegau-Tower (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | ||
Former [2016/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
09.12.2015
PackSys Global AG Joweid Zentrum 1 8630 Rüti ZH / CH Opponent's representative Wagner, Kilian, et al, et al Behrmann Wagner Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG) 78224 Singen / DE | 15.01.2016 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.06.2016 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.09.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2017 | 29.09.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 09.10.2017 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2018/07] | 16.10.2017 | Date of oral proceedings |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.07.2013 | AL | 11.03.2015 | AT | 11.03.2015 | CY | 11.03.2015 | CZ | 11.03.2015 | DK | 11.03.2015 | EE | 11.03.2015 | FI | 11.03.2015 | HR | 11.03.2015 | LT | 11.03.2015 | LV | 11.03.2015 | MC | 11.03.2015 | MK | 11.03.2015 | MT | 11.03.2015 | NL | 11.03.2015 | RO | 11.03.2015 | RS | 11.03.2015 | SE | 11.03.2015 | SI | 11.03.2015 | SM | 11.03.2015 | NO | 11.06.2015 | GR | 12.06.2015 | IS | 11.07.2015 | PT | 13.07.2015 | IE | 29.07.2015 | LU | 29.07.2015 | BE | 31.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 29.07.2013 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MK | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
SM | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | HU | 29.07.2013 | |
AT | 11.03.2015 | ||
CY | 11.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
BE | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
MT | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
IE | 29.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
LU | 29.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
MC | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
SI | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
DK | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 11.03.2015 | |
CZ | 11.03.2015 | ||
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
IS | 11.07.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 11.03.2015 | |
EE | 11.03.2015 | ||
FI | 11.03.2015 | ||
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RO | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
PT | 13.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 11.03.2015 | |
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
NL | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 11.03.2015 | |
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
LV | 11.03.2015 | ||
RS | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 11.03.2015 | |
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
GR | 12.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 11.03.2015 | |
HR | 11.03.2015 | ||
LT | 11.03.2015 | ||
SE | 11.03.2015 | ||
NO | 11.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 11.03.2015 | |
NO | 11.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR1445014 (AMERICAN CAN CO) [X] 1-6 * page 2, column 2, line 34 - page 3, column 1, line l; figures 2, 5 * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]LU81001 (MINMETAL SRL [IT]) [Y] 5 * figures 1, 5 *; | [Y]GB2098917 (MAEGERLE KARL) [Y] 4* page 2, line 111 - line 115; figure 1 *; | [A]WO03013965 (MAEGERLE KARL LIZENZ [MU], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 7, paragraph l - page 9, paragraph l2; figures 1-2 * | by applicant | US3260411 | Opposition | FR445014 | GB757562 | GB772964 | US3260411 | LU81001 | GB2022547 | GB2098917 | JPS60172659 | US4792061 | JPH08169453 | JP2001158448 | JP2002193283 | WO03013965 | DE10137937 | JP2004284678 | US2007210027 | JP2011148512 | JP2011195144 | WO2012140038 | DE112006002709 |