EP2682382 - Method for Producing Phenylacetamide Compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2017 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Chemical Company, Limited 27-1, Shinkawa 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8260 / JP | [2014/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ishida, Hajime 127-24-601 Kanbaiotsu Saijo-shi, Ehime 793-0021 / JP | 02 /
Hirota, Masaji 2-1-342 Kuwata-cho Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-0841 / JP | 03 /
Tagami, Yoko 1-15-201 Shimaya 1-Chome Konohana-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 554-0024 / JP | 04 /
Mizushima, Yuya 3-10-63 Matsuzono-cho Misawa-shi, Aomori 033-0037 / JP | [2014/04] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2016/47] |
Former [2014/02] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13178853.1 | 12.02.2010 | [2014/02] | Priority number, date | JP20090032333 | 16.02.2009 Original published format: JP 2009032333 | JP20090139899 | 11.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009139899 | JP20090232242 | 06.10.2009 Original published format: JP 2009232242 | [2014/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2682382 | Date: | 08.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2682382 | Date: | 26.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2682382 | Date: | 23.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C07C231/08, C07C231/06, C07C231/12, C07C235/34 | [2014/02] | CPC: |
C07C231/06 (EP,KR,US);
C07C231/08 (KR);
C07C231/12 (KR);
C07C235/34 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C231/06, C07C235/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/47] |
Former [2014/02] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Phenylacetamidverbindung | [2014/02] | English: | Method for Producing Phenylacetamide Compound | [2014/02] | French: | Procédé de production de composé phénylacétamide | [2014/02] | Examination procedure | 21.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/40] | 01.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10741332.0 / EP2397459 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100741332) is 22.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.11.2016 | BE | 23.11.2016 | CY | 23.11.2016 | EE | 23.11.2016 | FI | 23.11.2016 | HR | 23.11.2016 | LV | 23.11.2016 | MC | 23.11.2016 | MK | 23.11.2016 | NL | 23.11.2016 | SE | 23.11.2016 | SI | 23.11.2016 | SK | 23.11.2016 | SM | 23.11.2016 | IE | 12.02.2017 | LU | 12.02.2017 | MT | 12.02.2017 | BG | 23.02.2017 | NO | 23.02.2017 | GR | 24.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | IS | 23.03.2017 | PT | 23.03.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
MK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2017 | ||
LU | 12.02.2017 | ||
MT | 12.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
CY | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2017 | ||
LU | 12.02.2017 | ||
MT | 12.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2017 | ||
LU | 12.02.2017 | ||
MT | 12.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
IE | 12.02.2017 | ||
LU | 12.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
LU | 12.02.2017 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SI | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
MC | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
SM | 23.11.2016 | ||
BG | 23.02.2017 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
BE | 23.11.2016 | ||
EE | 23.11.2016 | ||
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
SK | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/29] | AT | 23.11.2016 | |
FI | 23.11.2016 | ||
HR | 23.11.2016 | ||
LV | 23.11.2016 | ||
NL | 23.11.2016 | ||
SE | 23.11.2016 | ||
NO | 23.02.2017 | ||
GR | 24.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
PT | 23.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 23.11.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0754672 (SHIONOGI & CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * pages 41-49; compounds 62-133 * * example 18 * * claim 34 ** pages 20-21 *; | JPH0995462 [ ] (SHIONOGI & CO) [ ] * paragraphs [0022] , [0023] , [0034] , [0037] , [0057] , [0058] * * examples *; | WO0210101 [ ] (SHIONOGI & CO [JP], et al) [ ] * example 35 *; | JP2003026640 [ ] (SHIONOGI & CO) [ ] * paragraph [0088] *; | [X] - OOTSUKA, SHUNICHI ET AL, "Preparation of .alpha.-hydroxyphenylacetic acid derivatives as agricultural bactericides", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 1997:371871, URL: STN, XP002714187 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - MASUI, MORIYASU ET AL, "Process for producing optically active alcohol by asymmetric hydrogen-transfer reduction of ketones with chiral transition metal complex having amide compound as ligand", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2002:107282, URL: STN, XP002714188 [X] 1-10 * abstract * | [X] - MASUI, MORIYASU ET AL, "Preparation of phenyl ketones from esters and o-(aminomethyl)phenyl halides", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2003:68569, URL: STN, XP002714189 [X] 1-10 * abstract * |