EP2693612 - Improvement in construction of electric machines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.04.2016 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hamilton Sundstrand Corporation One Hamilton Road Windsor Locks, CT 06096-1010 / US | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Veronesi, William A. 342 Fairfield Avenue Hartford, CT Connecticut 06114 / US | 02 /
El-Wardany, Tahany Ibrahim 14 C West Lane Bloomfield, CT Connecticut 06002 / US | 03 /
Dardona, Sameh 35 Stoughton Drive South Windsor, CT Connecticut 06074 / US | 04 /
Schmidt, Wayde R. 7 Amberg Drive Pomfred Center, CT Connecticut 06259 / US | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Bridge, Kerry Ann Dehns St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2014/06] | Application number, filing date | 13178881.2 | 01.08.2013 | [2014/06] | Priority number, date | US201213566615 | 03.08.2012 Original published format: US201213566615 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693612 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2693612 | Date: | 03.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02K15/00, H02K15/02 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
H02K15/00 (EP,US);
B33Y10/00 (EP,US);
B33Y30/00 (EP,US);
H02K15/0012 (EP,US);
H02K15/02 (EP,US);
Y10T156/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/23] |
Former [2014/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verbesserung bei der Konstruktion von elektrischen Maschinen | [2014/06] | English: | Improvement in construction of electric machines | [2014/06] | French: | Amélioration dans la construction de machines électriques | [2014/06] | Examination procedure | 04.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/37] | 13.01.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.04.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.01.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.03.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2013 | AL | 03.06.2015 | AT | 03.06.2015 | BE | 03.06.2015 | CY | 03.06.2015 | CZ | 03.06.2015 | DK | 03.06.2015 | EE | 03.06.2015 | ES | 03.06.2015 | FI | 03.06.2015 | HR | 03.06.2015 | IT | 03.06.2015 | LT | 03.06.2015 | LV | 03.06.2015 | MC | 03.06.2015 | MK | 03.06.2015 | MT | 03.06.2015 | NL | 03.06.2015 | PL | 03.06.2015 | RO | 03.06.2015 | RS | 03.06.2015 | SE | 03.06.2015 | SI | 03.06.2015 | SK | 03.06.2015 | SM | 03.06.2015 | TR | 03.06.2015 | IE | 01.08.2015 | LU | 01.08.2015 | BG | 03.09.2015 | NO | 03.09.2015 | GR | 04.09.2015 | IS | 03.10.2015 | PT | 06.10.2015 | DE | 01.03.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 01.08.2013 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MK | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
SM | 03.06.2015 | ||
TR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 01.08.2013 | |
AT | 03.06.2015 | ||
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CY | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
NL | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SE | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
MT | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
BE | 03.06.2015 | ||
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
IE | 01.08.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
DE | 01.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SI | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
IT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
DK | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
MC | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/17] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
LU | 01.08.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
CZ | 03.06.2015 | ||
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
PL | 03.06.2015 | ||
RO | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
SK | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
IS | 03.10.2015 | ||
PT | 06.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
EE | 03.06.2015 | ||
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 03.06.2015 | |
ES | 03.06.2015 | ||
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
BG | 03.09.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 03.06.2015 | |
FI | 03.06.2015 | ||
HR | 03.06.2015 | ||
LT | 03.06.2015 | ||
LV | 03.06.2015 | ||
RS | 03.06.2015 | ||
NO | 03.09.2015 | ||
GR | 04.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO0000344 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [I] 1,10 * figure 13 * * pages 21,23,25 *; | [A]US4356377 (NORTON JAMES F, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]CA2411675 (VAREL INTERNATIONAL INC [US]) [A] 1 * figures 8,9 *; | [I] - Brian B Mathewson ET AL, "Machine Design, Control and Performance of Automated Computer-Aided Manufacturing of Laminated Engineering Materials", Proc. 9th Solid Freeform Fabricatioj Symp., Austin, Texas, USA, (19980101), pages 227 - 238, URL: http://utwired.engr.utexas.edu/lff/symposium/proceedingsArchive/pubs/Manuscripts/1998/1998-36-Mathewson.pdf, (20131120), XP055089323 [I] 1-14 * the whole document * | [X] - DUTTA ET AL, "Heterogeneous Solid Modeling for Layered Manufacturing", CIRP ANNALS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, CH, FR, (20000101), vol. 49, no. 1, doi:10.1016/S0007-8506(07)62907-2, ISSN 0007-8506, pages 109 - 112, XP022136905 [X] 1,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0007-8506(07)62907-2 | [A] - KRUTH ET AL, "Progress in Additive Manufacturing and Rapid Prototyping", CIRP ANNALS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, CH, FR, (19980101), vol. 47, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0007-8506(07)63240-5, ISSN 0007-8506, pages 525 - 540, XP022146131 [A] 1 * page 536 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0007-8506(07)63240-5 | [A] - HASHEM GHARIBLU ET AL, "A new machine for layer manufacturing of metal parts", MECHATRONICS AND ITS APPLICATIONS (ISMA), 2012 8TH INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM ON, IEEE, (20120410), doi:10.1109/ISMA.2012.6215185, ISBN 978-1-4673-0860-1, pages 1 - 5, XP032186029 [A] 1 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISMA.2012.6215185 | [A] - SANDIG S ET AL, "Manufacturing of metallic prototypes and tools by laser cutting and diffusion bonding", INTELLIGENT PROCESSING AND MANUFACTURING OF MATERIALS, 1999. IPMM '99. PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HONOLULU, HI, USA 10-15 JULY 1999, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, US, (19990710), vol. 1, ISBN 978-0-7803-5489-0, pages 251 - 253, XP010351582 [A] 1 * the whole document * | [A] - SANTOS ET AL, "Rapid manufacturing of metal components by laser forming", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF MACHINE TOOL DESIGN AND RESEARCH, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (20061001), vol. 46, no. 12-13, doi:10.1016/J.IJMACHTOOLS.2005.09.005, ISSN 0020-7357, pages 1459 - 1468, XP005585831 [A] 1 * figures 3-5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.ijmachtools.2005.09.005 | [A] - Debasish Dutta ET AL, "Layered Manufacturing: Current Status and Future Trends", doi:10.1115/1.1355029#, (20010101), URL: http://www.cs.cmu.edu/~lew/PUBLICATION PDFs/RP/JCISE 2001.pdf, (20121018), XP055041474 [A] 1 * table 1 * * paragraph [0006] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1115/1.1355029# | [T] - KOU ET AL, "Heterogeneous object modeling: A review", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, (20070414), vol. 39, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.CAD.2006.12.007, ISSN 0010-4485, pages 284 - 301, XP022040150 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cad.2006.12.007 | [T] - KUMAR V ET AL, "A framework for object modeling", COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN, ELSEVIER PUBLISHERS BV., BARKING, GB, vol. 31, no. 9, ISSN 0010-4485, (19990801), pages 541 - 556, (19990801), XP027214245 [T] * the whole document * | [T] - WU ET AL, "A CAD modeling system for heterogeneous object", ADVANCES IN ENGINEERING SOFTWARE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, OXFORD, GB, (20080118), vol. 39, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.ADVENGSOFT.2007.03.002, ISSN 0965-9978, pages 444 - 453, XP022426623 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.advengsoft.2007.03.002 | [T] - CHOI S H ET AL, "A topological hierarchy-based approach to layered manufacturing of functionally graded multi-material objects", COMPUTERS IN INDUSTRY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS. AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 60, no. 5, doi:10.1016/J.COMPIND.2009.01.008, ISSN 0166-3615, (20090601), pages 349 - 363, (20090228), XP026022586 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.compind.2009.01.008 | [T] - BERNARD ET AL, "New Trends in Rapid Product Development", CIRP ANNALS, ELSEVIER BV, NL, CH, FR, (20020101), vol. 51, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0007-8506(07)61704-1, ISSN 0007-8506, pages 635 - 652, XP022136746 [T] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0007-8506(07)61704-1 |