EP2693262 - Polarizing prescription eyewear having a three-dimensional viewing function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Y-Johnson Co., Ltd. 3F.-4, No. 17, Yuping 3rd Street Anping District Tainan City 70843 / TW | For all designated states Tzeng, Ching-Biau No. 3, Aly. 180, Lane 40, Dawan Road Yongkang District Tainan City 71062 / TW | [2014/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tzeng, Ching-Biau No. 3, Aly. 180, Ln. 40, Dawan Rd. Yongkang Dist. Tainan City, 71062 / TW | [2014/06] | Representative(s) | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/06] | Midgley, Jonathan Lee Scott & York Intellectual Property Ltd 45 Grosvenor Road St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB | Application number, filing date | 13178898.6 | 01.08.2013 | [2014/06] | Priority number, date | TW20120128029 | 03.08.2012 Original published format: TW 101128029 | [2014/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2693262 | Date: | 05.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02C7/12, H04N13/04 | [2014/06] | CPC: |
G02C7/12 (EP,US);
H04N13/337 (EP,US);
G02B30/25 (EP,US);
G03B35/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Polarisierende 3D Brillen mit Korrektur von Sehfehlern | [2014/06] | English: | Polarizing prescription eyewear having a three-dimensional viewing function | [2014/06] | French: | Lunettes à prescription polarisée ayant une fonction de visualisation tridimensionnelle | [2014/06] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/05] | 11.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/05] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2010132897 (MICROVISION OPTICAL INC [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0016]; figures 1,2; claims 1-11 *; | [A]US2010033675 (MIYOSHI KAZUYUKI [JP]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2011113012 (VIKING SYSTEM INC [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 14, line 19 - page 15, line 7; claims 13,14 *; | [XI]WO2011091314 (OAKLEY INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0056] , [0117] , [0127]; figures 13-15 * [I] 2-9; | [I]EP2362249 (YAMAMOTO KOGAKU [JP]) [I] 1-9 * paragraph [0179] - paragraph [0181]; figures 2-14 *; | [AD]US2011199680 (SAYLOR RYAN [US], et al) [AD] 1-9 * the whole document * |