EP2832918 - LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/06] | Laundry treatment apparatus and method for operating a laundry treatment apparatus | ||
[2017/40] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, MK | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Electrolux Appliances Aktiebolag St Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kustra, Agnieszka Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 02 /
Ros, Paolo Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | 03 /
Vian, Alessandro Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Electrolux Group Patents AB Electrolux Group Patents 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2018/05] |
Former [2015/06] | Petruccelli, Davide, et al Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | Application number, filing date | 13178974.5 | 01.08.2013 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832918 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2832918 | Date: | 31.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/04, D06F58/28 | [2017/36] | CPC: |
D06F58/38 (EP,US);
D06F2101/20 (EP,US);
D06F2103/32 (EP,US);
D06F2103/36 (EP,US);
D06F2105/24 (EP,US);
D06F2105/30 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/06] | D06F58/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/37] |
Former [2015/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER WÄSCHEBEHANDLUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2017/40] | English: | LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR OPERATING A LAUNDRY TREATMENT APPARATUS | [2017/40] | French: | APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DU LINGE ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN TEL APPAREIL | [2017/40] |
Former [2015/06] | Wäschebehandlungsvorrichtung und Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Wäschebehandlungsvorrichtung | ||
Former [2015/06] | Laundry treatment apparatus and method for operating a laundry treatment apparatus | ||
Former [2015/06] | Appareil de traitement du linge et procédé pour faire fonctionner un tel appareil | Examination procedure | 24.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2015 | Examination requested [2015/37] | 05.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.12.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.11.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.08.2013 | AL | 31.01.2018 | AT | 31.01.2018 | CY | 31.01.2018 | CZ | 31.01.2018 | DK | 31.01.2018 | EE | 31.01.2018 | ES | 31.01.2018 | FI | 31.01.2018 | HR | 31.01.2018 | LT | 31.01.2018 | LV | 31.01.2018 | MC | 31.01.2018 | MK | 31.01.2018 | NL | 31.01.2018 | PL | 31.01.2018 | PT | 31.01.2018 | RO | 31.01.2018 | RS | 31.01.2018 | SE | 31.01.2018 | SI | 31.01.2018 | SK | 31.01.2018 | SM | 31.01.2018 | TR | 31.01.2018 | BG | 30.04.2018 | NO | 30.04.2018 | GR | 01.05.2018 | IS | 31.05.2018 | GB | 01.08.2018 | IE | 01.08.2018 | LU | 01.08.2018 | MT | 01.08.2018 | BE | 31.08.2018 | CH | 31.08.2018 | FR | 31.08.2018 | LI | 31.08.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/28] | HU | 01.08.2013 | |
AL | 31.01.2018 | ||
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PT | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
GB | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
TR | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
GB | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
GB | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.08.2018 | ||
MT | 01.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
GB | 01.08.2018 | ||
IE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.08.2018 | ||
BE | 31.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
FR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/33] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
IE | 01.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
LU | 01.08.2018 | ||
CH | 31.08.2018 | ||
LI | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
MC | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SI | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
SM | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
DK | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 31.01.2018 | ||
EE | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RO | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
SK | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.01.2018 | |
AT | 31.01.2018 | ||
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 30.04.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 31.01.2018 | |
ES | 31.01.2018 | ||
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
LV | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
RS | 31.01.2018 | ||
SE | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
IS | 31.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
GR | 01.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | ES | 31.01.2018 | |
FI | 31.01.2018 | ||
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
PL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | FI | 31.01.2018 | |
HR | 31.01.2018 | ||
LT | 31.01.2018 | ||
NL | 31.01.2018 | ||
NO | 30.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2392725 (V ZUG AG [CH]) [X] 1,2,5-7 * paragraph [0016] *; | [X]WO2012084474 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0008] , [0020]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2011146102 (BELLINETTO ENRICO [IT], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0014] , [0024] , [0031]; figures 7,8 *; | [A]EP1767687 (WHIRLPOOL CO [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] , [0029]; figure 4 * | Examination | GB2002891 |