EP2832854 - Method for improving the recombinant expression of a polypeptide by C-terminal fusion to human neprilysin [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.2016 [2016/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F. Hoffmann-La Roche AG Grenzacher Strasse 124 4070 Basel / CH | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knoetgen, Hendrik Agathe-Fleissner-Weg 16 82377 Penzberg / DE | 02 /
Niewoehner, Jens Leuthener-Strasse 21A 81476 München / DE | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patentabteilung Nonnenwald 2 82377 Penzberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Burger, Alexander, et al Roche Diagnostics GmbH Patent Department (LPP.....6164) P.O.Box 11 52 82372 Penzberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13179034.7 | 02.08.2013 | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2832854 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/64, C12N15/67, C12N15/85 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
C12N9/6494 (EP);
C07K16/18 (EP);
C07K16/2881 (EP);
C12N15/67 (EP);
C07K2317/55 (EP);
C07K2319/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Verbesserung der rekombinanten Expression eines Polypeptids durch C-terminale Fusion mit menschlichem Neprilysin | [2015/06] | English: | Method for improving the recombinant expression of a polypeptide by C-terminal fusion to human neprilysin | [2015/06] | French: | Méthode d'amélioration de l'expression d'une polypeptide par la fusion C-terminale avec neprilysin humaine | [2015/06] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2013 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 05.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/06] | 15.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/06] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2011160732 (MEDIMMUNE LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * example 5; claims 1-8 * [Y] 6,8 [I] 9,10; | [X]US2008242590 (ANDERSSON CHRISTIN [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * example 2 *; | [X]US2008274096 (ANDERSSON CHRISTIN [SE], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0110] - paragraph [0111]; example 2 *; | [X] - GUAN HANJUN ET AL, "Peripherally Expressed Neprilysin Reduces Brain Amyloid Burden: A Novel Approach for Treating Alzheimer's Disease", JOURNAL OF NEUROSCIENCE RESEARCH, WILEY-LISS, US, (20090501), vol. 87, no. 6, ISSN 0360-4012, pages 1462 - 1473, XP002589911 [X] 1-5,7 * page 1463, column right, paragraph 1 * | [Y] - ESPOSITO D ET AL, "Enhancement of soluble protein expression through the use of fusion tags", CURRENT OPINION IN BIOTECHNOLOGY, LONDON, GB, vol. 17, no. 4, doi:10.1016/J.COPBIO.2006.06.003, ISSN 0958-1669, (20060801), pages 353 - 358, (20060801), XP024962788 [Y] 6,8 * figure 1; table 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.copbio.2006.06.003 | by applicant | WO9833523 | WO9852976 | WO0034317 | US5202238 | US5204244 | US5648237 | US5789199 | US5840523 | US5959177 | US6040498 | US6420548 | US7125978 | US6417429 | - Current Protocols in Molecular Biology, WILEY AND SONS, (1997), vol. I-III | - SINGER, 0., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 5313 - 5314 | - MORRISON, S.L. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - RIECHMANN, L. ET AL., NATURE, (1988), vol. 332, pages 323 - 327 | - NEUBERGER, M.S. ET AL., NATURE, (1985), vol. 314, pages 268 - 270 | - LONBERG, N., NAT. BIOTECHNOL., (2005), vol. 23, pages 1117 - 1125 | - HUSTON, J.S. ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, pages 5879 - 5883 | - BIRD, R.E. ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, pages 423 - 426 | - HUNKAPILLER, T.; HOOD, L., NATURE, (1986), vol. 323, pages 15 - 16 | - FLATMAN, S. ET AL., J. CHROM. B, (2007), vol. 848, pages 79 - 87 | - CHARLTON, Methods in Molecular Biology, HUMANA PRESS, (2003), vol. 248, pages 245 - 254 | - GERNGROSS, NAT. BIOTECH., (2004), vol. 22, pages 1409 - 1414 | - LI ET AL., NAT. BIOTECH., (2006), vol. 24, pages 210 - 215 | - MATHER, BIOL. REPROD., (1980), vol. 23, pages 243 - 251 | - MATHER ET AL., ANNALS N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (1982), vol. 383, pages 44 - 68 | - URLAUB ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1980), vol. 77, page 4216 | - YAZAKI; WU, Methods in Molecular Biology, Antibody Engineering, HUMANA PRESS, (2004), vol. 248, pages 255 - 268 | - BOADO, R.J. ET AL., BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2009), vol. 102, pages 1251 - 1258 | - PACE ET AL., PROTEIN SCIENCE, (1995), vol. 4, pages 2411 - 2423 | - RICHARDS, J. NEUROSCIENCE, (2003), vol. 23, pages 8989 - 9003 |