EP2696462 - Methods and systems for controlling a power converter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.12.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.09.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.07.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.03.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2022/04] |
Former [2014/07] | For all designated states General Electric Company 1 River Road Schenectady, New York 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larsen, Einar Vaughn 1 River Road 53-300A Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [2014/07] | Representative(s) | Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 330 920 80069 München / DE | [2022/04] |
Former [2014/07] | Bedford, Grant Richard GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13179174.1 | 02.08.2013 | [2014/07] | Priority number, date | US201213572416 | 10.08.2012 Original published format: US201213572416 | [2014/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2696462 | Date: | 12.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2696462 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2696462 | Date: | 26.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H02J3/00 | [2014/07] | CPC: |
H02J3/46 (EP,US);
H02J3/44 (EP,US);
H02M5/42 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
H02J3/24 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/09] |
Former [2014/07] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Systeme zur Steuerung eines Leistungswandlers | [2014/07] | English: | Methods and systems for controlling a power converter | [2014/07] | French: | Procédés et systèmes permettant de commander un convertisseur de puissance | [2014/07] | Examination procedure | 02.08.2013 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.01.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2018 | Examination requested [2018/09] | 18.12.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2021 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.09.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.12.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2018 | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 02.08.2013 | AL | 26.01.2022 | AT | 26.01.2022 | CY | 26.01.2022 | CZ | 26.01.2022 | EE | 26.01.2022 | FI | 26.01.2022 | HR | 26.01.2022 | IT | 26.01.2022 | LT | 26.01.2022 | LV | 26.01.2022 | MC | 26.01.2022 | MK | 26.01.2022 | NL | 26.01.2022 | PL | 26.01.2022 | RO | 26.01.2022 | RS | 26.01.2022 | SE | 26.01.2022 | SI | 26.01.2022 | SK | 26.01.2022 | SM | 26.01.2022 | BG | 26.04.2022 | NO | 26.04.2022 | GR | 27.04.2022 | IS | 26.05.2022 | PT | 26.05.2022 | GB | 02.08.2022 | IE | 02.08.2022 | LU | 02.08.2022 | BE | 31.08.2022 | CH | 31.08.2022 | FR | 31.08.2022 | LI | 31.08.2022 | [2024/22] |
Former [2024/20] | HU | 02.08.2013 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CY | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 02.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2024/18] | HU | 02.08.2013 | |
AL | 26.01.2022 | ||
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 02.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/47] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
GB | 02.08.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
BE | 31.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
IT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
FR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
IE | 02.08.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
LU | 02.08.2022 | ||
CH | 31.08.2022 | ||
LI | 31.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/16] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
MC | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SI | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 26.01.2022 | |
AT | 26.01.2022 | ||
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SK | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
CZ | 26.01.2022 | ||
EE | 26.01.2022 | ||
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RO | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
SM | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/42] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
IS | 26.05.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/39] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
FI | 26.01.2022 | ||
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 26.01.2022 | |
HR | 26.01.2022 | ||
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
LV | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
PL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
GR | 27.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | HR | 26.01.2022 | |
LT | 26.01.2022 | ||
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
RS | 26.01.2022 | ||
SE | 26.01.2022 | ||
BG | 26.04.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
PT | 26.05.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | LT | 26.01.2022 | |
NL | 26.01.2022 | ||
NO | 26.04.2022 | ||
Former [2022/30] | NL | 26.01.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP2302783 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1-10* fig. 1, 2, 5, par. 2-5, 11-13, 17, 22-26, 28 *; | [X]EP2336554 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,2 * par. 6, 23-24, 30, 32, fig. 3, 4 * | Examination | EP2270974 |