EP2835787 - System for detecting customer media comprising an RF transceiver in a public transportation vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.03.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKIDATA AG Untersbergstrasse 40 5083 Grödig/Salzburg / AT | For all designated states EM Microelectronic-Marin SA Rue des Sors 3 2074 Marin / CH | [2016/50] |
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states SKIDATA AG Untersbergstrasse 40 5083 Grödig/Salzburg / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Surkau, Reinhard c/o SKIDATA AG Untersbergstrasse 40 5083 Grödig/Salzburg / AT | 02 /
Egli, Charles 22-24 Route de Genève 1033 Cheseaux / CH | 03 /
Maupas, Fabien 3 rue Parguez 25300 Pontarlier / FR | 04 /
Prevost, Olivier 20, rue Jean Monnet 25300 Pontarlier / FR | [2015/07] | Representative(s) | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Schönfelstraße 26 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/07] | Karakatsanis, Georgios Haft Karakatsanis Patentanwaltskanzlei Dietlindenstrasse 18 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13179399.4 | 06.08.2013 | [2015/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2835787 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2835787 | Date: | 27.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G07B15/02, G01S5/00 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
G07B15/02 (EP,US);
G06K7/10425 (US);
G01S13/75 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/11] | Title | German: | System zur Erfassung von Kundenmedien umfassend einen RF-Transceiver in einem öffentlichen Verkehrsmittel | [2015/07] | English: | System for detecting customer media comprising an RF transceiver in a public transportation vehicle | [2015/07] | French: | Système de détection de supports clients comprenant un émetteur-récepteur RF dans un moyen de transport public | [2015/07] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/11] | 25.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.08.2013 | AL | 27.04.2016 | BG | 27.04.2016 | CY | 27.04.2016 | CZ | 27.04.2016 | DK | 27.04.2016 | EE | 27.04.2016 | FI | 27.04.2016 | HR | 27.04.2016 | IS | 27.04.2016 | LT | 27.04.2016 | LV | 27.04.2016 | MC | 27.04.2016 | MK | 27.04.2016 | MT | 27.04.2016 | NL | 27.04.2016 | PL | 27.04.2016 | RO | 27.04.2016 | RS | 27.04.2016 | SE | 27.04.2016 | SI | 27.04.2016 | SK | 27.04.2016 | SM | 27.04.2016 | TR | 27.04.2016 | NO | 27.07.2016 | GR | 28.07.2016 | IE | 06.08.2016 | LU | 06.08.2016 | PT | 29.08.2016 | BE | 31.08.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 06.08.2013 | |
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
MT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
TR | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 06.08.2013 | |
BG | 27.04.2016 | ||
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
MT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | HU | 06.08.2013 | |
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
MT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 06.08.2013 | |
CY | 27.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 27.04.2016 | ||
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
IS | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
MK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
IE | 06.08.2016 | ||
LU | 06.08.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
MC | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SI | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
SM | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
SK | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 27.04.2016 | |
DK | 27.04.2016 | ||
EE | 27.04.2016 | ||
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RO | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 27.04.2016 | |
FI | 27.04.2016 | ||
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
SE | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
GR | 28.07.2016 | ||
PT | 29.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
HR | 27.04.2016 | ||
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
LV | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
RS | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 27.04.2016 | |
LT | 27.04.2016 | ||
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
PL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 27.04.2016 | |
NL | 27.04.2016 | ||
NO | 27.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/44] | NL | 27.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0120557 (HAENI PROLECTRON AG [CH], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * page 2, line 12 - page 4, line 2 * * page 25, line 26 - page 27, line 13 * * figure 10 *; | [A]US2008100450 (AYYAGARI ARUN [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0007] ** figure - *; | [A]US2011025464 (GENG WEI [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0062] * * figures 11,12 *; | [A]WO2011066327 (CUBIC CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0062] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0090] * |