EP2663134 - A method and base station to control access point transmit power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.02.2020 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, HU, MT | published on 27.07.2022 [2022/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2019/26] |
Former [2019/15] | For all designated states Ubiquisys Limited The Stella Building Windmill Hill Business Park Whitehall Way Swindon SN5 6NX / GB | ||
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Ubiquisys Limited The Stella Building Windmill Hill Business Park Whitehall Way Swindon SN5 6NX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Alan 13 Orwell Close Greenmeadow Swindon, Wiltshire SN25 3LZ / GB | 02 /
Whittaker, Stephen 15 Dorneywood Way Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FA / GB | 03 /
Maida, Aminu Wada 1 Water Lily Court Tuke Walk Swindon, Wiltshire SN1 4GR / GB | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2019/15] |
Former [2013/46] | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13179529.6 | 01.02.2008 | [2013/46] | Priority number, date | GB20070002094 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: GB 0702094 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2663134 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2663134 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663134 | Date: | 10.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/24, H04W52/14, H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W84/04, H04W88/08, H04W52/22, // H04J13/00, H04W16/16, H04W48/00, H04W24/02 | [2018/40] | CPC: |
H04W52/346 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04W52/225 (EP,CN,US);
H04W16/10 (GB);
H04W16/20 (GB);
H04W52/24 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/343 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/143 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/241 (GB);
H04W52/243 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2013/52] | H04W52/24, H04W52/14, H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W84/04, H04W88/08, // H04J13/00, H04W16/16, H04W48/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/46] | H04W52/24, H04W52/14, H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W84/04, H04W88/08, // H04J13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2019/15] |
Former [2013/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Basisstation zur Regelung der Zugangspunkt-Sendeleistung | [2013/46] | English: | A method and base station to control access point transmit power | [2013/46] | French: | Procédé et station de base afin de commander la puissance de transmission d'un point d'accès | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 24.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/31] | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.01.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08702006.1 / EP2119031 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080702006) is 28.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2008 | AT | 10.04.2019 | CY | 10.04.2019 | CZ | 10.04.2019 | DK | 10.04.2019 | EE | 10.04.2019 | ES | 10.04.2019 | FI | 10.04.2019 | HR | 10.04.2019 | IT | 10.04.2019 | LT | 10.04.2019 | LV | 10.04.2019 | MC | 10.04.2019 | MT | 10.04.2019 | NL | 10.04.2019 | PL | 10.04.2019 | RO | 10.04.2019 | SE | 10.04.2019 | SI | 10.04.2019 | SK | 10.04.2019 | TR | 10.04.2019 | BG | 10.07.2019 | NO | 10.07.2019 | GR | 11.07.2019 | IS | 10.08.2019 | PT | 10.09.2019 | [2022/27] |
Former [2020/49] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
MC | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SI | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
TR | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/12] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
IT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
EE | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
SK | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
RO | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
CZ | 10.04.2019 | ||
DK | 10.04.2019 | ||
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
IS | 10.08.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AT | 10.04.2019 | |
ES | 10.04.2019 | ||
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
PL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
BG | 10.07.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
HR | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
LV | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
GR | 11.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
SE | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
PT | 10.09.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | ES | 10.04.2019 | |
FI | 10.04.2019 | ||
LT | 10.04.2019 | ||
NL | 10.04.2019 | ||
NO | 10.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 10.04.2019 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9711567 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-18 * pages 10,11 * * page 12, lines 1-17 * * pages 84-89 * * page 96, lines 14-36 * * pages 97-99 * * page 109, line 30 - page 110, line 31 * * claims 38-45,57 * * figures 1,2,20,21 *; | [IA]WO9809465 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [I] 1,2,4,5,13,14,17,18 * claims 1-21 * * figures 1-4 * * page 10, line 19 - page 11, line L * * page 3, line 8 - line 22 * [A] 3,6-12,15,16; | [A]EP0865172 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 3 - line 17 * * page 6, line 11 - page 8, line 18 * * page 10, line 5 - line 52 * * page 12, line 14 - line 46 * * page 19, line 56 - page 20, line 46 * * page 12, lines 15-32 * * figures 1,2,5,6,16,17,20,22,23 * * claims 1-35 *; | [A]US6314294 (BENVENISTE MATHILDE [US]) [A] 1-18 * page 1, line 1 - line 25 * * page 4, line 3 - line 57 * * page 15, line 40 - page 16, line 67 * * page 17, lines 1-35 * * figures 8-10 * * claims 1,9 *; | [A]US6493331 (WALTON JAY R [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * claims 1-63 * * column 2, line 37 - line 48 * * column 3, line 41 - line 53 * * column 7, line 57 - line 59 ** column 13, line 36 - column 14, line L * |