EP2663135 - A method and base station to control access point transmit power [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2022 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2019/26] |
Former [2013/46] | For all designated states Ubiquisys Limited The Stella Building Windmill Hill Business Park Whitehall Way Swindon SN5 6NX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, Alan 13 Orwell Close Greenmeadow Swindon, Wiltshire SN25 3LZ / GB | 02 /
Whittaker, Stephen 15 Dorneywood Way Newbury, Berkshire RG14 2FA / GB | 03 /
Maida, Aminu Wada 1 Water Lily Court Tuke Walk Swindon, Wiltshire SN1 4GR / GB | [2013/46] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Gwilym Vaughan, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2021/18] |
Former [2013/46] | O'Connell, David Christopher, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13179530.4 | 01.02.2008 | [2013/46] | Priority number, date | GB20070002094 | 02.02.2007 Original published format: GB 0702094 | [2013/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2663135 | Date: | 13.11.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2663135 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2663135 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/24, H04W52/14, H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W84/04, H04W88/08, H04W52/22, H04W16/16, H04W48/00, // H04J13/00, H04W24/02 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
H04W52/346 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04W52/225 (EP,CN,US);
H04W16/10 (GB);
H04W16/20 (GB);
H04W52/24 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/343 (EP,CN,GB,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,CN,US);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/143 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,CN,US);
H04W52/241 (GB);
H04W52/243 (GB);
|
Former IPC [2014/01] | H04W52/24, H04W52/14, H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W84/04, H04W88/08, H04W52/22, H04W16/16, H04W48/00, // H04J13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2013/46] | H04W52/24, H04W52/14, H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W84/04, H04W88/08, // H04J13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/18] |
Former [2013/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Basisstation zur Regelung der Zugangspunkt-Sendeleistung | [2013/46] | English: | A method and base station to control access point transmit power | [2013/46] | French: | Procédé et station de base afin de commander la puissance de transmission d'un point d'accès | [2013/46] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/28] | 30.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.03.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP08702006.1 / EP2119031 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20080702006) is 28.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2008 | AT | 05.05.2021 | CY | 05.05.2021 | CZ | 05.05.2021 | DK | 05.05.2021 | EE | 05.05.2021 | ES | 05.05.2021 | FI | 05.05.2021 | HR | 05.05.2021 | IT | 05.05.2021 | LT | 05.05.2021 | LV | 05.05.2021 | MC | 05.05.2021 | NL | 05.05.2021 | PL | 05.05.2021 | RO | 05.05.2021 | SE | 05.05.2021 | SI | 05.05.2021 | SK | 05.05.2021 | BG | 05.08.2021 | NO | 05.08.2021 | GR | 06.08.2021 | IS | 05.09.2021 | PT | 06.09.2021 | IE | 01.02.2022 | LU | 01.02.2022 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 01.02.2008 | |
AT | 05.05.2021 | ||
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IE | 01.02.2022 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
LU | 01.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
MC | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/36] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
IT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SI | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
EE | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
RO | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
SK | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
CZ | 05.05.2021 | ||
DK | 05.05.2021 | ||
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/04] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
NL | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/52] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
PL | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
ES | 05.05.2021 | ||
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
IS | 05.09.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
PT | 06.09.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
HR | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
LV | 05.05.2021 | ||
SE | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
NO | 05.08.2021 | ||
GR | 06.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | ||
BG | 05.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 05.05.2021 | |
FI | 05.05.2021 | ||
LT | 05.05.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9711567 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * pages 10,11 * * page 12, lines 1-17 * * pages 84-89 * * page 96, lines 14-36 * * pages 97-99 * * claims 38-45,57 * * figures 1,2,20,21 *; | [A]US6314294 (BENVENISTE MATHILDE [US]) [A] 1-4 * page 1, line 11 - line 25 * * page 4, line 26 - line 50 * * page 16, lines 52-67 * * page 17, lines 1-35 * * figure 10 * * claims 1,9 *; | [A]US6438379 (GITLIN RICHARD DENNIS [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * claims 1-13 * * figures 1-3 * * column 1, line 40 - line 53 * * column 3, line 7 - line 50 *; | [X]WO2006010958 (RICHARDSON ANDREW [GB]) [X] 1-4 * claims 1-49 * * figures 1,2,9,10,11 * * page 1, line 1 - page 3, line 24 * * page 8, line 19 - line 23 * * page 15, line 21 - page 23, line 19 *; | [AP]WO2007015066 (UBIQUISYS LTD [GB], et al) [AP] 1-4 * pages 14,15 * * page 16, lines 1-10 * * claims 1-49 ** figure 1 * | by applicant | US6314294 |